This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:42:19 (UTC).

State Farm and Casualty Company et al v. Broan-Nutone LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 State Farm and Casualty Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Broan-Nutone LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nicholas A Danella. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas A Danella

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State Farm and Casualty Company

Vameshia Carmichael

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Defendants

Broan-Nutone LLC

AO Smith Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin David Cohn

Attorney at WILLIAMS ELLIOTT & COHN, LLC

1924 29Th Avenue South

Birmingham, AL 35209

Defendant Attorneys

Catherine E Milling

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE

1901 6Th Avenue North, Ste. 1700

Birmingham, AL 35203

John A Earnhardt

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

1901 6Th Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

J Chandler Bailey

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

The Clark Building, 400 20Th Street, North

Birmingham, AL 35203

James W Gibson

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Tatum Leigh Jackson

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT, FRANKLIN & WHITE, LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Earnhardt, John) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Vameshia Carmichael, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Cohn, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#15

(#15) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Broan-Nutone LLC. filed by Broan-Nutone LLC (Earnhardt, John) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine E Milling on behalf of Broan-Nutone LLC (Milling, Catherine) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AO Smith Corporation. filed by AO Smith Corporation (Jackson, Tatum) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broan-Nutone LLC. filed by Broan-Nutone LLC (Earnhardt, John) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Broan-Nutone LLC.(Earnhardt, John) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER - Pursuant to General Order For Referral of Civil matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than March 31, 2022. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 31, 2022. A telephone conference is hereby SET for 10:00 AM on Monday, March 7, 2022. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-363-4735 access code 6785641. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on February 14, 2022. (MEB2) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by James W Gibson on behalf of AO Smith Corporation (Gibson, James) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Vameshia Carmichael. AO Smith Corporation served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022; Broan-Nutone LLC served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. (MEB2) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to AO Smith Corporation, Broan-Nutone LLC via certified U.S. mail. (DNW) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Vameshia Carmichael, State Farm and Casualty Company. (Cohn, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm and Casualty Company (Cohn, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#1

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Broan-Nutone LLC.(Earnhardt, John) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella: Telephone Conference held on 3/14/2022 Atty Cohn present for plaintiffs; Attys Milling & Earnhardt present for deft Broan-Nutone LLC; Atty Jackson present for deft AO Smith Corporation (MEB2) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Earnhardt, John) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Vameshia Carmichael, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Cohn, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference regarding consent to magistrate jurisdiction that is currently set for Monday, March 7, 2022 is RESET for Monday, March 14, 2022, at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Danella. The parties should dial (888) 363-4735 and enter access code 6785641 to participate in the conference. The parties are reminded that they are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by no later than March 31, 2022. The telephone conference will be cancelled by separate order if all parties have submitted their elections beforehand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on February 28, 2022. (MEB2) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Broan-Nutone LLC. filed by Broan-Nutone LLC (Earnhardt, John) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine E Milling on behalf of Broan-Nutone LLC (Milling, Catherine) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AO Smith Corporation. filed by AO Smith Corporation (Jackson, Tatum) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broan-Nutone LLC. filed by Broan-Nutone LLC (Earnhardt, John) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Broan-Nutone LLC.(Earnhardt, John) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER - Pursuant to General Order For Referral of Civil matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than March 31, 2022. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 31, 2022. A telephone conference is hereby SET for 10:00 AM on Monday, March 7, 2022. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-363-4735 access code 6785641. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on February 14, 2022. (MEB2) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on February 14, 2022. (MEB2) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Tatum Leigh Jackson on behalf of AO Smith Corporation (Jackson, Tatum) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by James W Gibson on behalf of AO Smith Corporation (Gibson, James) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AO Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bailey, J) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Vameshia Carmichael. AO Smith Corporation served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022; Broan-Nutone LLC served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. (MEB2) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to AO Smith Corporation, Broan-Nutone LLC via certified U.S. mail. (DNW) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B4601117999. (DNW) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Vameshia Carmichael, State Farm and Casualty Company. (Cohn, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm and Casualty Company (Cohn, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AO Smith Corporation, Broan-Nutone LLC, filed by State Farm and Casualty Company, Vameshia Carmichael.(KEK) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE FARM & CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant