This case was last updated from PACER on 06/21/2021 at 09:53:10 (UTC).

State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Jackson et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 State Auto Property Casualty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Jackson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00405

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants

Rodney Smith

Shores Builders, Inc.

Rodney Jackson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert M. Chemers

Attorney at Pretzel & Stouffer, Chartered

One South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jonathan L. Federman

Attorney at Pretzel & Stouffer, Chartered

One South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Bruce R. Cook

Attorney at Cook, Bartholomew, Shevlin & Cook, LLP

12 West Lincoln Street

Belleville, IL 62220

Martin J. Buckley

Attorney at Buckley & Buckley, L.L.C.

800 Market Street, Suite 2900

St. Louis, MO 63101

Beth C. Boggs

Attorney at Boggs, Avellino, Lach & Boggs, LLC

9326 Olive Boulevard, Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63132

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Exhibit A - Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment

#25

(#25) MOTION for Leave to File a Permissive Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment by Rodney Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment)(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#24

(#24) MOTION for Leave to File a Permissive Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment by Rodney Jackson. (Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#23

(#23) MOTION to Set Aside Default by Rodney Smith. (Cook, Bruce) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#22

(#22) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rodney Smith.(clt) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce R. Cook on behalf of Rodney Smith (Cook, Bruce) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Entry of Default by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT RODNEY JACKON'S JURY DEMAND by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rodney Jackson.(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#3

(#6) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #3 Notice of Appearance filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Document stricken as ordered by the Court. Incorrect forms used. Filer will re-file documents. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

1 #6

Summons Shores Builders

1 #5

Summons Rodney Jackson

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - 3rd Party Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - 2nd Amended Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Policy

#1

(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rodney Jackson.(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER GRANTING #23 MOTION to Set Aside Default as Counsel for Plaintiff has no objection. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/18/2021. (drr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Leave to File a Permissive Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment by Rodney Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment)(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Leave to File a Permissive Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment by Rodney Jackson. (Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Set Aside Default by Rodney Smith. (Cook, Bruce) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rodney Smith.(clt) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce R. Cook on behalf of Rodney Smith (Cook, Bruce) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Entry of Default by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT RODNEY JACKON'S JURY DEMAND by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rodney Jackson.(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Rodney Jackson (Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Rodney Jackson, Shores Builders, Inc., Rodney Smith. Originals mailed to requesting party. (clt) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Federman on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Federman, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Chemers on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #3 Notice of Appearance filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Document stricken as ordered by the Court. Incorrect forms used. Filer will re-file documents. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Plaintiffs. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-00405-RJD. Consent due by 5/14/2021 (clt) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STRICKEN. NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Federman on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Federman, Jonathan) Modified on 4/23/2021 (clt). (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STRICKEN. NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Chemers on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Chemers, Robert) Modified on 4/23/2021 (clt). (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4461440.), filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 2nd Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - 3rd Party Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Rodney Jackson, #6 Summons Shores Builders)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan L Federman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M Chemers