This case was last updated from PACER on 10/31/2020 at 08:42:28 (UTC).

State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Amerisure Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 State Auto Property Casualty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Amerisure Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen P. McGlynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00886

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen P. McGlynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants

Elizabeth Foutch

Amerisure Insurance Company

Donald Foutch

Keller Construction, Inc.

Tindall Construction, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert M. Chemers

Attorney at Pretzel & Stouffer, Chartered

One South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jonathan L. Federman

Attorney at Pretzel & Stouffer, Chartered

One South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Gregory T. Cook

Attorney at McAnany, Van Cleave et al - St. Louis

505 North 7Th St., Suite 2100

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Memo in Support

#16

(#16) MOTION to Strike #12 Answer to Complaint, by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(Federman, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Federman on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Federman, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#12

(#12) Defendants Keller Construction, Inc., Tindall Construction, Inc., and Amerisure Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Amerisure Insurance Company, Keller Construction, Inc., Tindall Construction, Inc..(Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Defendants Keller Construction, Inc. And Tindall Construction, Inc.s Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Plead Or Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint For Declaratory Judgment by Amerisure Insurance Company, Keller Construction, Inc., Tindall Construction, Inc.. (Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory T. Cook on behalf of Amerisure Insurance Company, Keller Construction, Inc., Tindall Construction, Inc. (Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Tindall Construction, Inc. served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

1 #10

Summons Amerisure Summons

1 #9

Summons Tindall Construction, Inc. Summons

1 #8

Summons Keller Construction Summons

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4270499.), filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Keller Construction Summons, #9 Summons Tindall Construction, Inc. Summons, #10 Summons Amerisure Summons)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Strike #12 Answer to Complaint, by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(Federman, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Federman on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Federman, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. With no objection on file, defendants, Keller Construction, Inc. and Tindall Construction, Inc., are granted up to and including October 5, 2020, to answer or otherwise plead or respond to plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 10/13/2020. (jce) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#13) Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 277, this case is transferred from Judge Staci M. Yandle and reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Unless the newly assigned judge directs otherwise, all deadlines and hearing dates shall remain in effect. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 20-886-SPM. (jaj) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendants Keller Construction, Inc., Tindall Construction, Inc., and Amerisure Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Amerisure Insurance Company, Keller Construction, Inc., Tindall Construction, Inc..(Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Defendants Keller Construction, Inc. And Tindall Construction, Inc.s Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Plead Or Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint For Declaratory Judgment by Amerisure Insurance Company, Keller Construction, Inc., Tindall Construction, Inc.. (Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory T. Cook on behalf of Amerisure Insurance Company, Keller Construction, Inc., Tindall Construction, Inc. (Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Tindall Construction, Inc. served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Keller Construction, Inc. served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-886-SMY. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Amerisure Insurance Company, Keller Construction, Inc., Tindall Construction, Inc. Original documents sent to attorney Robert M. Chemers for service. (rah) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-886-RJD. Consent due by 9/23/2020 (ack) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Chemers on behalf of State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4270499.), filed by State Auto Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Keller Construction Summons, #9 Summons Tindall Construction, Inc. Summons, #10 Summons Amerisure Summons)(Chemers, Robert) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less