This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2020 at 08:52:25 (UTC).

Stasko v. Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I, LP et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2020 Stasko filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01153

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra A Stasko

Defendants

Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I GP, LLC

Second Wave Acquisition, LLC

Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I, LP

Second Wave Capital Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Karen Ann Doner

Attorney at Doner Law, PLC

1750 Tysons Boulevard, Suite 1500

Tysons Corner, VA 22102

Defendant Attorney

Nicholas T Solosky

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

1030 15Th St Nw Ste 380 East

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #16

Summons to Second Wave Capital Management, LLC

1 #15

Summons to Second Wave Acquisition, LLC

1 #14

Summons to Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I GP, LLC

1 #7

Exhibit G to Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas T Solosky on behalf of Second Wave Acquisition, LLC, Second Wave Capital Management, LLC (Solosky, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I GP, LLC, Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I, LP (c/m 06/02/2020 ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/2/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I GP, LLC, Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I, LP (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Sandra A Stasko (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Doner, Karen) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra A Stasko. Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I GP, LLC served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020.(Doner, Karen) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra A Stasko. Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I, LP served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020.(Doner, Karen) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Second Wave Capital Management, LLC. Second Wave Capital Management, LLC waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020.(Catron, Emily) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Second Wave Acquisition, LLC. Second Wave Acquisition, LLC waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020.(Catron, Emily) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Second Wave Acquisition, LLC, Second Wave Capital Management, LLC, Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I GP, LLC, Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I, LP.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against all Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8640414.), filed by Sandra A Stasko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit F to Complaint, #7 Exhibit G to Complaint, #8 Exhibit H to Complaint, #9 Exhibit I to Complaint, #10 Exhibit J to Complaint, #11 Exhibit K to Complaint, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons to Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I, LP, #14 Summons to Taveekan Capital Finance Fund I GP, LLC, #15 Summons to Second Wave Acquisition, LLC, #16 Summons to Second Wave Capital Management, LLC)(Doner, Karen) Modified on 5/6/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICHOLAS T. SOLOSKY