This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2020 at 14:54:26 (UTC).

Starr v. Price

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 Starr filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Price. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler, PSLC CET, PSLC HHL and Edward J. Davila. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02243

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

Edward J. Davila

Referral Judges

PSLC CET

PSLC HHL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shannon Lee Starr

Coalinga, CA 93210

Respondent

Brandon Price

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#6

(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

4 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Shannon Lee Starr. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#3

(#3) (Corrected) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

1 #2

Filing Fee Receipt

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (no process) against Brandon Price, (Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 34611148275). Filed by Shannon Lee Starr. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope, #(2) Filing Fee Receipt) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Shannon Lee Starr. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope)(tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (Corrected) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (no process) against Brandon Price, (Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 34611148275). Filed by Shannon Lee Starr. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope, #(2) Filing Fee Receipt) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less