This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2020 at 10:10:50 (UTC).

Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company, LTD. et al v. Damco USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Starr Indemnity Liability Insurance Company, LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Damco USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Cowan Wright and Nancy E. Brasel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01775

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

Presiding Judge

Nancy E. Brasel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Target Corporation

Starr Indemnity & Liability Company

Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company, LTD.

Defendant

Damco USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica K. Allen

Attorney at Pfefferle Kane LLP

100 North Sixth Street, Ste 600A

Minneapolis, MN 55403

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Target Corporation. Damco USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Allen, Jessica) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Damco USA, Inc. (KDS) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Damco USA, Inc.. (Allen, Jessica) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company, LTD.. (Allen, Jessica) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILED IN ERROR. Amended Summons Returned Unexecuted by Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company, LTD. as to Damco USA, Inc.. (Allen, Jessica) Modified text on 8/26/2020 (KDS). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Damco USA, Inc., filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company, LTD., Target Corporation. No summons requested. (Allen, Jessica) Modified text on 8/17/2020 (lmb). (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Damco USA, Inc.. (kt) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1775 NEB/ECW. (kt) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Target Corporation. (Allen, Jessica) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint filed by Damco USA, Inc. filed by Target Corporation. (Allen, Jessica) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Damco USA, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7969268) filed by Target Corporation. No summons requested. (Allen, Jessica) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAMCO USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Starr Indemnity & Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica K. Allen