This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/13/2021 at 15:25:14 (UTC).

Starr Indemnity & Liability Company v. Kiewit Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Starr Indemnity Liability Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Kiewit Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00288

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Starr Indemnity & Liability Company

Defendants

Manson Construction Co

Kiewit Corporation

General Construction Co

Kiewit Infrastructure West Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel J Park

Attorney at LEGROS BUCHANAN & PAUL (WA)

4025 Delridge Way Sw, Suite 500

Seattle, WA 98106

Eric R McVittie

Attorney at LEGROS BUCHANAN & PAUL (WA)

4025 Delridge Way Sw, Suite 500

Seattle, WA 98106

Defendant Attorneys

Donald K McLean

Attorney at BAUER MOYNIHAN & JOHNSON

2101 4Th Ave, Ste 2400

Seattle, WA 98121-2320

Jennifer Milliman Higgins

Attorney at BAUER MOYNIHAN & JOHNSON

2101 4Th Ave, Ste 2400

Seattle, WA 98121-2320

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL re Parties' #7 Stipulation. This matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LH) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice by parties (McVittie, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 5/5/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/21/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/28/2021. (LC) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Milliman Higgins on behalf of Defendants General Construction Co, Kiewit Corporation, Kiewit Infrastructure West Co, Manson Construction Co. (Higgins, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donald K McLean on behalf of Defendants General Construction Co, Kiewit Corporation, Kiewit Infrastructure West Co, Manson Construction Co. (McLean, Donald) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (McVittie, Eric) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Starr Indemnity & Liability Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/15/2021. (KB) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketJudge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SG) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendant(s) General Construction Company, Kiewit Corporation, Kiewit Infrastructure West Company, Manson Construction Co (Receipt # AWAWDC-6987494), filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(McVittie, Eric) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Construction Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Manson Construction Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where KIEWIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KIEWIT PACIFIC CO. is a litigant