This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2021 at 08:48:50 (UTC).

Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc. v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Starr Indemnity Liability Company, Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laura Taylor Swain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08643

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Taylor Swain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc.

399 Park Avenuesecond Floor

New York, NY 10022

Defendant

MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Val Edmund Wamser

Attorney at Nicoletti Hornig & Sweeney

88 Pine Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 12/27/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/14/2021) (pc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 12/27/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/14/2021) (pc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Val Edmund Wamser. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Val Edmund Wamser to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 10/27/2021. (pc) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Starr Indemnity & Liability Company is a litigant