This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 08:30:36 (UTC).

Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc. et al v. C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Starr Indemnity Liability Company, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against C H Robinson Worldwide, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06595

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc.

Bemis Associates, Inc.

Defendant

C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Thomas Lillis, Jr

Attorney at Kennedy Lillis Schmidt & English

75 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Defendant Attorneys

George W. Wright

Attorney at George W. Wright & Associates, LLC

88 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Narinder S. Parmar

Attorney at George W. Wright & Associates, LLC

88 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

14 #4

Exhibit 4

14 #3

Exhibit 3

14 #2

Exhibit 2

14 #1

Exhibit 1

14 #14

Main Document

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney George W. Wright to RE-FILE Document #13 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Wright, George) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc...(Wright, George) Modified on 10/1/2021 (lb). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. served on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. Service was accepted by Vera Rosalez. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc.; Bemis Associates, Inc...(Lillis, John) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from George W. Wright, Esq. dated September 1, 2021. Application granted. C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. answer due 10/4/2021 (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/2/2021) (cf) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from George W. Wright, Esq. dated September 1, 2021. Document filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc...(Wright, George) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George W. Wright on behalf of C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc...(Wright, George) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Narinder S. Parmar on behalf of C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc...(Parmar, Narinder) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on October 29, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. The Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/13/2021) (va) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AMCOR PLC for Bemis Associates, Inc.. Document filed by Bemis Associates, Inc...(Lillis, John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Starr International Company, Inc. for Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc.. Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc...(Lillis, John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bemis Associates, Inc., Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc...(Lillis, John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lillis, John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24888264)Document filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Inc., Bemis Associates, Inc...(Lillis, John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Starr Indemnity & Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Narinder S. Parmar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George W. Wright