This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2022 at 09:52:42 (UTC).

Starling v. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Starling filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlton W. Reeves and LaKeysha Greer Isaac. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00750

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlton W. Reeves

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dwayne Starling

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel F. Dillard

Attorney at JOEL F. DILLARD, PA

775 North Congress Street

Jackson, MS 39202

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Kimberly Hodges

Attorney at OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK & STEWART, PC - Memphis

6410 Poplar Avenue, Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1- EEOC Charge

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Right to Sue

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to General Motors LLC. (LAT) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#3

(#3) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by General Motors LLC (Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. General Motors LLC answer due 1/24/2022. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 1/5/22 (NL) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by General Motors LLC (Hodges, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to General Motors LLC. (LAT) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against General Motors LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4709674), filed by Dwayne Starling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit 2- Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) Modified on 11/19/2021 to reflect correct date filed (LAT) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Kimberly Hodges