This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2020 at 08:30:44 (UTC).

Starks v. Populus Group LLC.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Starks filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Populus Group LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David R. Grand and Laurie J. Michelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-12439

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

Presiding Judge

Laurie J. Michelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Levi Starks

Defendant

Populus Group LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Noah S. Hurwitz

Attorney at NachtLaw, P.C.

101 N. Main Street, Suite 555

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Defendant Attorneys

Mark W. Wallin

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

Alex M. Petrik

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

3000 Town Center, Suite 2440

Southfield, MI 48075

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Wallin on behalf of Populus Group LLC.. (Wallin, Mark) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M. Petrik on behalf of Populus Group LLC.. (Petrik, Alex) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Populus Group LLC.. (Petrik, Alex) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Populus Group LLC.* (SKra) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Levi Starks against Levi Starks with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8028962 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hurwitz, Noah) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Populus Group, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noah S. Hurwitz