This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:54:11 (UTC).

Stark v. Shield Casework, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Stark filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Shield Casework, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are John T. Maughmer and Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00970

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John T. Maughmer

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Stark

Defendant

Shield Casework, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac David Keppler

Attorney at Colantuono Bjerg Guinn Keppler, LLC

7015 College Boulevard, Suite 375

Overland Park, KS 66211

Defendant Attorney

Brian E Peterson

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-KCMO

1000 Walnut Street, Suite 1400

Kansas City, MO 64106-2140

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of settlement and Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines by Amanda Stark (Keppler, Isaac) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#4

(#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/26/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 1/14/2020. Signed on 12/19/2019 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

3 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Shield Casework, LLC.(Peterson, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-CV29462, filed by Brian E Peterson on behalf of Shield Casework, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMOWDC-6614087. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Peterson, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #6 The Court has reviewed the parties' Notice of Settlement and Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines. The parties' request to stay all deadlines is GRANTED. The parties shall file dismissal paperwork or a joint status report by April 30, 2020. Signed on 1/27/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of settlement and Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines by Amanda Stark (Keppler, Isaac) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Please note new case number: 19-970-CV-W-BP. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 12/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/26/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 1/14/2020. Signed on 12/19/2019 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to both plaintiff and defense counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 12/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Shield Casework, LLC.(Peterson, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-CV29462, filed by Brian E Peterson on behalf of Shield Casework, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMOWDC-6614087. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Peterson, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less