This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/20/2022 at 07:13:26 (UTC).

Stark v. ABC Pediatric Clinic, P.A. et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2021 Stark filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against ABC Pediatric Clinic, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-03822

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Jessica Stark

Defendants and Counter Claimants

ABC Pediatric Clinic, P.A.

Silen Pahlavan

Sogol Pahlavan

Mohammad Parvizian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Cory Steven Fein

Attorney at Attorney at Law

712 Main Stste 800

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Charles Howard Wilson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

1301 Mckinney Streetsuite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Counterclaims, filed by Jessica Stark. (Fein, Cory) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ABC Pediatric Clinic's Counterclaims by Jessica Stark, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fein, Cory) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Counterclaims filed by ABC Pediatric Clinic, P.A.. (Wilson, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) First AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Jessica Stark filed by ABC Pediatric Clinic, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wilson, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Counterclaims by Jessica Stark, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fein, Cory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#8

(#8) E-MAIL from Charles H. Wilson re: initial conference, filed. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#6

(#6) Order: Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2022 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#5

(#5) CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Initial conference held. Appearances: Cory Fein. Ct Reporter: N/A. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Jessica Stark by Mohammad Parvizian, ABC Pediatric Clinic, P.A., Sogol Pahlavan, Silen Pahlavan, filed.(Wilson, Charles) (Entered: 11/28/2021)

#3

(#3) Order: Initial Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 02:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(RachelSalazaradi, 4) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

1 #1

Notice of Removal

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Counterclaims, filed by Jessica Stark. (Fein, Cory) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ABC Pediatric Clinic's Counterclaims by Jessica Stark, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fein, Cory) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Counterclaims filed by ABC Pediatric Clinic, P.A.. (Wilson, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Jessica Stark filed by ABC Pediatric Clinic, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wilson, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Counterclaims by Jessica Stark, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fein, Cory) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) E-MAIL from Charles H. Wilson re: initial conference, filed. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order: Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2022 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Initial conference held. Appearances: Cory Fein. Ct Reporter: N/A. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Jessica Stark by Mohammad Parvizian, ABC Pediatric Clinic, P.A., Sogol Pahlavan, Silen Pahlavan, filed.(Wilson, Charles) (Entered: 11/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order: Initial Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 02:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(RachelSalazaradi, 4) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 113rd District Court, Harris County Texas, case number 2021-66870 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27374634) filed by Mohammad Parvizian, ABC Pediatric Clinic, P.A., Sogol Pahlavan, Silen Pahlavan. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(Wilson, Charles) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Howard Wilson