This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:34:06 (UTC).

STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ketanji Brown Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01939

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ketanji Brown Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING

Defendants

U S Customs and Border Protection

U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

Peter S. Herrick

Attorney at PETER S HERRICK PA

4324 Bayshore Blvd Ne

St Petersburg, FL 33703

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ERRATA re #11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#11

(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/12/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/11/2020. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#10

(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 7/31/2020 (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#9

(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July 30, 2020. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#8

(#8) GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/28/2020. (jag) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

7 #1

Notice and Consent

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#6

(#6) ERRATA by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 07/19/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 07/19/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 07/19/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING filed by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING.(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against U S Customs and Border Protection ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7356145) filed by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING.(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ERRATA re #11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/12/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/11/2020. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 7/31/2020 (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July 30, 2020. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/28/2020. (jag) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ERRATA by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 07/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 07/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 07/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING filed by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING.(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against U S Customs and Border Protection ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7356145) filed by STARK LINK ENGINEERING EQUIPMENT TRADING.(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less