This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/01/2023 at 05:37:06 (UTC).

Star Insurance Company v. Singh et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 Star Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Singh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric R. Komitee and Taryn A. Merkl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-07968

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric R. Komitee

Referral Judge

Taryn A. Merkl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Star Insurance Company

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Inderpal Singh

Sikander Singh

Tejinder Singh

Sarbjit Singh

Harvinder Pal Singh

State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Baci's Pet Palace Inc

Wesco Insurance Company

Crossbay Associates LLC

Norguard Insurance Company

At-Saf, Inc.

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Cross Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Thomas Bradley

Attorney at Marshall, Conway & Bradley P.C.

45 Broadway, Suite 740

New York, NY 10006

Maria Teresa Ehrlich

Attorney at Marshall Conway Bradley Gollub & Weissman, P.C.

45 Broadway, Suite 740

New York, NY 10006

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Stuart D. Markowitz

575 Jericho Tpke, Suite 210

Jericho, NY 11753

Max Gershweir

Attorney at Kennedy's CMK LLP

570 Lexington Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Insurance Company. Sarbjit Singh served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023. (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#42

(#42) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Insurance Company. Harvinder Pal Singh served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023. (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#41

(#41) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Star Insurance Company as to Sarbjit Singh. (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#40

(#40) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Star Insurance Company as to Harvinder Pal Singh. (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#39

(#39) Summons Reissued as to Sarbjit Singh. (SG) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#38

(#38) Summons Reissued as to Harvinder Pal Singh. (SG) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#37

(#37) Proposed Summons. by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#36

(#36) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#35

(#35) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Markowitz, Stuart) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#35) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Markowitz, Stuart) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Insurance Company. Sarbjit Singh served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023. (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Insurance Company. Harvinder Pal Singh served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023. (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Star Insurance Company as to Sarbjit Singh. (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Star Insurance Company as to Harvinder Pal Singh. (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Summons Reissued as to Sarbjit Singh. (SG) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Summons Reissued as to Harvinder Pal Singh. (SG) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketSTATUS REPORT ORDER: On 12/30/2022, Plaintiff filed a Complaint. On 1/17/2023 and 1/30/2023, summonses were returned executed on Defendant Norguard Insurance Company, Defendant Crossbay Associates LLC, Defendant At-Saf, Inc, Defendant Baci's Pet Palace, Defendant Inderpal Singh, Defendant Sikander Singh and DefendantTejinder Singh. To date, an answer to the Complaint has not been filed by said Defendants. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 3/8/2023 advising the Court of the current status of the case as to these defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 2/15/2023. (KC) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Proposed Summons. by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Markowitz, Stuart) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. by Star Insurance Company (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Star Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AmeriTrust Group, Inc for Star Insurance Company. (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16267708 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Star Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ehrlich, Maria) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less