This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2022 at 09:46:58 (UTC).

Star Fabrics, Inc. v. Centric Denim USA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 Star Fabrics, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Centric Denim USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05968

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Star Fabrics, Inc.

Defendants

Centric Denim USA, LLC

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Dillards, Inc.

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M. Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Kelsey Marie Schultz

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A. Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorney

Samuel Yu

Attorney at Kahana and Feld LLP

2603 Main Street Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33859027 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Star Fabrics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (sh) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Centric Denim USA, LLC, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Dillards, Inc., Does. (sh) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#10

(#10) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc., upon Defendant Centric Denim USA, LLC served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company c/o Robin Hutt-Banks\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc., upon Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company c/o Robin Hutt-Banks\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc., upon Defendant Dillards, Inc. served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company c/o Robin Hutt-Banks\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Dillards, Inc. answer now due 10/24/2022; Costco Wholesale Corporation answer now due 10/24/2022; Centric Denim USA, LLC answer now due 10/24/2022, filed by Defendants Dillards, Inc.; Costco Wholesale Corporation; Centric Denim USA, LLC.(Attorney Samuel Yu added to party Centric Denim USA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Yu added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Yu added to party Dillards, Inc.(pty:dft))(Yu, Samuel) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Dillards, Inc. answer now due 10/24/2022; Costco Wholesale Corporation answer now due 10/24/2022; Centric Denim USA, LLC answer now due 10/24/2022, filed by Defendants Dillards, Inc.; Costco Wholesale Corporation; Centric Denim USA, LLC.(Attorney Samuel Yu added to party Centric Denim USA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Yu added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Yu added to party Dillards, Inc.(pty:dft))(Yu, Samuel) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc., upon Defendant Dillards, Inc. served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company c/o Robin Hutt-Banks\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc., upon Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company c/o Robin Hutt-Banks\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc., upon Defendant Centric Denim USA, LLC served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company c/o Robin Hutt-Banks\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Centric Denim USA, LLC, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Dillards, Inc., Does. (sh) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (sh) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33859027 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Star Fabrics, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Star Fabrics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Star Fabrics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dillard's Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant