This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2019 at 08:06:08 (UTC).

STAPLES v. D.M. BOWMAN, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 STAPLES filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against D M BOWMAN, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04345

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD STAPLES

Defendant

D.M. BOWMAN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darron S. Stewart

Attorney at STEWART & STEWART

931 South Rangeline Road

Carmel, IN 46032

Cherry Malichi

Attorney at STEWART & STEWART

931 S. Rangeline Road

Carmel, IN 46032

Tiffany Ruth Guthrie

Attorney at STEWART & STEWART

931 S. Rangeline Road

Carmel, IN 46032

Defendant Attorneys

Steven F. Pockrass

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Amanda C. Couture

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Cherry Malichi withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/20/2019. (JRB) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#12

(#12) MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Plaintiff RICHARD STAPLES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Malichi, Cherry) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Ruth Guthrie on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD STAPLES. (Guthrie, Tiffany) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File A Response to the Complaint to 12/27/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/25/2019. (JRB) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to December 27, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant D.M. BOWMAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 12:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/6/2019.(JRB) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant D.M. BOWMAN, INC.. (Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#5

(#5) STATUS REPORT by D.M. Bowman, Inc.. (Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by D.M. Bowman, Inc.. (Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F. Pockrass on behalf of Defendant D.M. Bowman, Inc.. (Pockrass, Steven) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda C. Couture on behalf of Defendant D.M. Bowman, Inc.. (Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit State Court Record (CCS, Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Proof of Servi

1 #2

Exhibit Notice to State Court and Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, Division 2, case number 49D02-1909-CT-039677, filed by D.M. Bowman, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5695033) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court and Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit State Court Record (CCS, Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Proof of Service on Defendant, Appearance, Defendant's Notice of Automatic Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Cherry Malichi withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/20/2019. (JRB) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Plaintiff RICHARD STAPLES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Malichi, Cherry) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Ruth Guthrie on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD STAPLES. (Guthrie, Tiffany) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File A Response to the Complaint to 12/27/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/25/2019. (JRB) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to December 27, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant D.M. BOWMAN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 12:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/6/2019.(JRB) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant D.M. BOWMAN, INC.. (Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATUS REPORT by D.M. Bowman, Inc.. (Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by D.M. Bowman, Inc.. (Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F. Pockrass on behalf of Defendant D.M. Bowman, Inc.. (Pockrass, Steven) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda C. Couture on behalf of Defendant D.M. Bowman, Inc.. (Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, Division 2, case number 49D02-1909-CT-039677, filed by D.M. Bowman, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5695033) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court and Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit State Court Record (CCS, Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Proof of Service on Defendant, Appearance, Defendant's Notice of Automatic Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Couture, Amanda) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D.M. BOWMAN, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven F. Pockrass

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda C. Couture