This case was last updated from PACER on 05/21/2021 at 09:59:28 (UTC).

Stanton et al v. Sentinel Peak Capital LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Stanton filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sentinel Peak Capital LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan R Bolton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00499

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan R Bolton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Meta Huber

Fransisca Stanton

Oluronke Salako

Defendants

Sentinel Peak Capital LLC

Eduvision Incorporated a Missouri Corporation doing business as Arizona College doing business as Arizona College of Nursing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colleen M Auer

Attorney at Auer Law Firm PLLC

11445 E Via Linda, Ste. 2-529

Scottsdale, AZ 85259

Carrie Ann Laliberte

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC - Phoenix, AZ

2325 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Elaine Ann Ryan

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC - Phoenix, AZ

2325 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Patricia Nicole Syverson

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC - San Diego, CA

600 W Broadway, Ste. 900

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Kristin Marie Mackin

Attorney at Sims Mackin

3101 N Central Ave., Ste. 870

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Michael K Murray

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP - Boston, MA

100 Northern Ave.

Boston, MA 02210

Roberto M Braceras

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP - Boston, MA

100 Northern Ave.

Boston, MA 02210

Kathryn Ann Honecker

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Sean Patrick Healy

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Jon Peter Kardassakis

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

221 N Figueroa St., Ste. 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs Motion To Remand Or, In The Alternative, For Expedited Discovery And A Renewed Motion To Remand Based On The Local Controversy And/Or Home State Exceptions To CAFA Jurisdiction filed by Meta Huber, Oluronke Salako, Fransisca Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Syverson, Patricia) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

17 #1

Exhibit

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Errata re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #15 Affidavit, #14 Affidavit by Defendant Eduvision Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Honecker, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

15 #1

Exhibit Ex 1

#15

(#15) *DECLARATION of Kathryn Honecker re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Defendant Eduvision Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1)(Honecker, Kathryn) *Modified to correct event on 4/21/2021 (DXD). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#14

(#14) *DECLARATION of Tracy Schreiner re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendant Eduvision Incorporated. (Honecker, Kathryn) *Modified to correct event on 4/21/2021 (DXD). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs Motion To Remand Or, In The Alternative, For Expedited Discovery And A Renewed Motion To Remand Based On The Local Controversy And/Or Home State Exceptions To CAFA Jurisdiction filed by Eduvision Incorporated. (Honecker, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Sentinel Peak Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mackin, Kristin) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

1 #13

Exhibit (Part 8)

1 #12

Exhibit (Part 7)

1 #7

Exhibit (Part 2)

1 #6

Exhibit (Part 1-4)

1 #5

Exhibit (Part 1-3)

1 #4

Exhibit (Part 1-2)

1 #3

Exhibit 1 - MCSC Record (Part 1)

1 #2

Supplemental Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs Motion To Remand Or, In The Alternative, For Expedited Discovery And A Renewed Motion To Remand Based On The Local Controversy And/Or Home State Exceptions To CAFA Jurisdiction filed by Meta Huber, Oluronke Salako, Fransisca Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Syverson, Patricia) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Errata re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #15 Affidavit, #14 Affidavit by Defendant Eduvision Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Honecker, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Roberto M Braceras, Michael K Murray on behalf of Defendant Sentinel Peak Capital LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Kristin M. Mackin, Roberto M Braceras and Michael K Murray are substituted as counsel of record for Defendant Sentinel Peak Capital LLC in place of Attorney Kathryn Ann Honecker. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/20/21. (DXD) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) *DECLARATION of Kathryn Honecker re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Defendant Eduvision Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1)(Honecker, Kathryn) *Modified to correct event on 4/21/2021 (DXD). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) *DECLARATION of Tracy Schreiner re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendant Eduvision Incorporated. (Honecker, Kathryn) *Modified to correct event on 4/21/2021 (DXD). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs Motion To Remand Or, In The Alternative, For Expedited Discovery And A Renewed Motion To Remand Based On The Local Controversy And/Or Home State Exceptions To CAFA Jurisdiction filed by Eduvision Incorporated. (Honecker, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs Motion To Remand Or, In The Alternative, For Expedited Discovery And A Renewed Motion To Remand Based On The Local Controversy And/Or Home State Exceptions To CAFA Jurisdiction filed by Sentinel Peak Capital LLC. (Mackin, Kristin) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Sentinel Peak Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mackin, Kristin) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Errata re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Eduvision Incorporated.. (Honecker, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Colleen Auer re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs Motion To Remand Or, In The Alternative, For Expedited Discovery And A Renewed Motion To Remand Based On The Local Controversy And/Or Home State Exceptions To CAFA Jurisdiction by Plaintiffs Meta Huber, Oluronke Salako, Fransisca Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Syverson, Patricia) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs Motion To Remand Or, In The Alternative, For Expedited Discovery And A Renewed Motion To Remand Based On The Local Controversy And/Or Home State Exceptions To CAFA Jurisdiction by Meta Huber, Oluronke Salako, Fransisca Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Syverson, Patricia) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jon Peter Kardassakis on behalf of Defendant Eduvision Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER pursuant to #5 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint shall be extended to and including ten (10) days after the date of the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Jurisdictional Discovery Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/29/21. (MAW) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) by Eduvision Incorporated, Sentinel Peak Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Honecker, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Eduvision Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19277411. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00499-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Service of Process re: Certificate, Notice(s), Waiver(s), Summons, Complaint, Exhibit(s) upon CT Corporation System on 3/4/20; Certificate of Service re: Summons, Notice of Filing First Amended Class Action Complaint upon Sentinel Peak Capital LLC on 3/4/21(original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 3/9/21).(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eduvision Incorporated. (Honecker, Kathryn) (BAC) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-051793. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-19277411 filed by Eduvision Incorporated. (Honecker, Kathryn) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 - MCSC Record (Part 1), #4 Exhibit (Part 1-2), #5 Exhibit (Part 1-3), #6 Exhibit (Part 1-4), #7 Exhibit (Part 2), #8 Exhibit (Part 3), #9 Exhibit (Part 4), #10 Exhibit (Part 5), #11 Exhibit (Part 6), #12 Exhibit (Part 7), #13 Exhibit (Part 8), #14 Exhibit (Part 9))(BAC) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie A Laliberte

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia N Syverson