This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/22/2022 at 21:36:15 (UTC).

Stansbury v. McCarty Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 Stansbury filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against McCarty Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01909

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lennard H Stansbury

Defendants and Cross Defendants

McCarty Corporation

Anco Insulations Inc

Cajun Company

Eagle Inc

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Zurich American Insurance Company

Ameron International Corporation

Armstrong International, Inc.

Crane Company

Hercules, LLC

International Paper Company

Powell Valves

Sank Inc

William Nicholas Massimini

Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc.

Employers Insurance Company of Wausau

Lamorak Insurance Company

Onebeacon Insurance Company

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Chevron Oronite Company LLC

Cross Defendant, Cross Claimant and Defendant

Sank Inc

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant

Employers Insurance Company of Wausau

Defendant, 3Rd Party Defendant and Cross Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

81 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mickey P. Landry

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Frank J. Swarr

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jefferson B. Goldman

Attorney at Fishman Haygood LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, 46Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jeffrey A. O'Connell

Attorney at Nemeroff Law Firm (Dallas)

12720 Hillcrest Rd., Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75230

Matthew C. Clark

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Philip C Hoffman

Attorney at Philip C. Hoffman, LLC

541 Julia Street, Suite 302

New Orleans, LA 70130

Ryan Pete Phillips

Attorney at Nemeroff Law Firm (Dallas)

12720 Hillcrest Rd., Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75230

Defendant Attorneys

Susan Beth Kohn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne, LLC

616 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

April Ann McQuillar

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas Kinler

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas Watson Redfearn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

James R. Guidry

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin, & Hubbard

601 Poydras Street, Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Douglas R. Elliott

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Etienne Francis Rene

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jamie Hebert Baglio

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Margaret M. Joffe

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2215

New Orleans, LA 70130

James L. Pate

Attorney at NeunerPate (Lafayette)

One Petroleum Center, P. O. Drawer 52828

Lafayette, LA 70503

Elizabeth Bailly Bloch

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

4605 Bluebonnet Boulevard, Ste. A

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Other Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

87 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#146

(#146) ANSWER to #129 Amended Complaint, by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau.(Pisano, Charles) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#145

(#145) ORDER granting #143 Motion to Dismiss Party. Lennard H. Stansbury's claims against defendant Ameron International Corporation in the above-captioned matter are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own court costs, specifically reserving plaintiff's rights to timely prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, third parties, solidary obligors, and any other persons and/or entities named or not named. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/22/22. (cg) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

143 #1

Proposed Order

143 #143

Main Document

#142

(#142) ORDER granting #140 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Gulf Engineering Company, LLC (as successor-by-merger to Gulf Engineering Company, Inc.) dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own court costs, specifically reserving plaintiff's rights to timely prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, third parties, solidary obligors, and any other persons and/or entities named or not named. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/18/2022. (cwa) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

140 #1

Proposed Order

140 #140

Main Document

138 #1

Proposed Order

#129

(#146) ANSWER to #129 Amended Complaint, by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau.(Pisano, Charles) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

4 #2

Summons Hopeman Brothers

#3

(#3) Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal.(pp) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

272 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) ANSWER to #129 Amended Complaint, by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau.(Pisano, Charles) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) ORDER granting #143 Motion to Dismiss Party. Lennard H. Stansbury's claims against defendant Ameron International Corporation in the above-captioned matter are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own court costs, specifically reserving plaintiff's rights to timely prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, third parties, solidary obligors, and any other persons and/or entities named or not named. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/22/22. (cg) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#144) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #143 MOTION to Dismiss Party.**Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. No further action necessary.** (pp) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party by Ameron International Corporation. (Elam, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2022: #1 Proposed Order) (pp). (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) ORDER granting #140 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Gulf Engineering Company, LLC (as successor-by-merger to Gulf Engineering Company, Inc.) dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own court costs, specifically reserving plaintiff's rights to timely prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, third parties, solidary obligors, and any other persons and/or entities named or not named. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/18/2022. (cwa) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#141) ORDER GRANTING #138 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS ORDERED that Shelley L. Thompson of Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker, and Carey, LLC is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for defendant Armstrong in the above-captioned matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Donna M. Young of Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker, and Carey, LLC is hereby ENROLLED as counsel of record for defendant Armstrong in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/17/2022. (pp) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#140) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Gulf Engineering Company, LLC by Lennard H. Stansbury, and Gulf Engineering Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burg, Jeffrey) Modified text on 3/18/2022 (pp). (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#139) ORDER GRANTING #134 Motion to Dismiss Party. Lennard H. Stansbury's claims against defendant Crane Company in the above-captioned matter are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own court costs. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/16/2022. (pp) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney Donna M. Young in place of Shelley L. Thompson by Armstrong International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Young, Donna) Modified text on 3/17/2022 (pp). (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) ORDER GRANTING #135 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS ORDERED that Shelley L. Thompson of Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker, and Carey, LLC is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for defendant Sank in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/16/2022. (pp) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Request for Summons Issued.**Filing attorney added a duplicate party to the case. When filing, select a party already named/listed in the case. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Ameron International Corporation, Anco Insulation, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Chevron Oronite Company, Crane Co., Dixie Machine, Welding & Metal Works, Inc., Eagle Inc, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Hercules, LLC, Hoepman Brothers, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., International Paper Company(individually and as successor by merger to Champion International Corporation, successor by merger to United States (U.S.) Plywood Corporation), Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(as the liability insurer of Dixie Machine, Welding & Metal Works, Inc. and its Executive Officers), Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(as insurer of Wayne Manufacturing Co.), M.W. Custom Papers, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Powell Valves, Sank, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company(as insurer of The Cajun Company, f/k/a Cajun Insulation Company;), Union Carbide Corporation, Uniroyal Holdings, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons)(pp) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request of Summons Issued as to Ameron International Corporation, Anco Insulation, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Chevron Oronite Company, Crane Co., Eagle, Inc., Ameron, Dixie Machine, Hercules, International Paper, Powell Valves, Sank, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Union Carbide, Employers Ins. Company of Wausau as alleged insurer of Dixie Machine, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Co as alleged insurer of Dixie Machine, Zurich, Travelers Indemnity Company, Hoepman Brothers, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Uniroyal Holdings, Inc., manville, MW Custom Papers filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #6 Answer to Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons)(Gillen, Laura) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Emergency MOTION to Sever and Remand by Lennard H Stansbury. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Notice of Submission)(O'Connell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #4 Third Party Complaint, and Crossclaim with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Ameron International Corporation, Anco Insulations Inc, Armstrong International, Inc., Chevron Oronite Company LLC, Crane Company, Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc.,Eagle, Inc., Hercules, LLC, International Paper Company, Powell Valves, Sank, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach,Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Travelers, Bayer CropScience, Hopeman Brothers, Uniroyal Holdings, Manville Personal, M.W. Custom Papers by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Gillen, Laura) Modified text on 10/22/2021 (pp). (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, MW Custom Papers, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Uniroyal Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(pp) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, Third Party Demands and Request for Trial by Jury to Employers Insurance Company of Wausau's Third Party Demand, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hopeman Brothers Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Uniroyal Holdings, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., MW Custom Papers, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Ameron International Corporation, Anco Insulations Inc, Armstrong International, Inc., Chevron Oronite Company LLC, Crane Company, Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc., Eagle Inc, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Hercules, LLC, International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Powell Valves, Sank Inc, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Zurich American Insurance Company(as successor-by-merger to Maryland Casualty company, as the insurer of Gulf Engineering Company, LLC) by Albert L. Bossier Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bayer Cropscience, #2 Summons Hopeman Brothers, #3 Summons Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., #4 Summons Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, #5 Summons MW Custom Papers LLC, #6 Summons Uniroyal Holding, Inc.)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal.(pp) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, case number 2020-9901 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9070166) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert L. Bossier Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier Jr.(pty:3pd).(Melancon, David) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chevron Oronite Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cajun Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hercules LLC is a litigant