This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2021 at 09:27:16 (UTC).

Stanley v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Stanley filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are N. Reid Neureiter and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00996

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peggy Stanley

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DezaRae D. LaCrue

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Karen Hannah Wheeler

Attorney at Wheeler Law PC

5690 Dtc Boulevard, Suite 240E

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Nicholas James Deaver

Attorney at Wheeler Law PC

5690 Dtc Boulevard, Suite 240E

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Exhibit

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Deaver, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9 April 2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#9

(#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (trvo, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#8

(#8) Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's ANSWER and Jury Demand to #5 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(trvo, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#7

(#7) STATE COURT ORDER Re: Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Adrianna Douglas With Prejudice by Summit County District Court Judge Mark D. Thompson on 04/08/2021. (trvo, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 02/18/2021. (trvo, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Peggy Stanley.(trvo, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Peggy StanleyAttorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Peggy Stanley(pty:pla) (LaCrue, DezaRae) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Deaver, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

1 #16

Exhibit Exhibit N

1 #15

Exhibit Exhibit M

1 #14

Exhibit Exhibit L

1 #13

Exhibit Exhibit K

1 #12

Exhibit Exhibit J

1 #11

Exhibit Exhibit I

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit H

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit G

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Deaver, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9 April 2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/9/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (trvo, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's ANSWER and Jury Demand to #5 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(trvo, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT ORDER Re: Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Adrianna Douglas With Prejudice by Summit County District Court Judge Mark D. Thompson on 04/08/2021. (trvo, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 02/18/2021. (trvo, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Peggy Stanley.(trvo, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Peggy StanleyAttorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Peggy Stanley(pty:pla) (LaCrue, DezaRae) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Deaver, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Summit County District Court, Case Number 2021CV030023. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7807528), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit Exhibit T)(Wheeler, Karen) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less