This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2019 at 07:56:23 (UTC).

Stanley, Tyler v. Jess, Cathy et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Stanley, Tyler filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Jess, Cathy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William M. Conley

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyler Stanley

Green Bay, WI 54307-9033

Defendants

John/Jane Doe #2

Cathy Jess

Jean Lutsey

R.N. Rachel M. Larson

Jodene Perttu

John/Jane Doe #4

John/Jane Doe #1

William Pollard

John/Jane Doe #3

Not Classified By Court

GBCI Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Letter from Plaintiff Tyler Stanley re: delay in e-filed submissions being received by the court; requesting to be transferred to another institution. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

23 #1

Envelope

#23

(#23) Letter from plaintiff Stanley Tyler regarding being transferred and if case could be sped up. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#22

(#22) Letter from Plaintiff Tyler Stanley requesting court order to obtain HSU/dental files. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#21

(#21) Letter / Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff Tyler Stanley. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#20

(#20) Letter from Clerk's Office to plaintiff regarding settlement letters, and in response to #18 confirmation request. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#19

(#19) Letter from plaintiff regarding an inmate who may send a filing to the court in plaintiff's name. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

18 #1

Disbursement request

#18

(#18) Letter from plaintiff requesting confirmation of initial partial payment. (Attachments: #1 Disbursement request) (jef),(ps) Modified filing date on 2/11/2019 (jef). (Entered: 02/11/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Inmate Placed in Temporary Lockup

#5

(#5) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 4.38 assessed due 2/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/11/2019. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

3 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

#3

(#3) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tyler Stanley. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Exhibit 1-9 - Inmate Complaint, Interview/Information Requests, Health Service R

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tyler Stanley. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-9 - Inmate Complaint, Interview/Information Requests, Health Service Requests, Psychological Service Request, #2 Cover Letter) (rks) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Letter from Plaintiff Tyler Stanley re: delay in e-filed submissions being received by the court; requesting to be transferred to another institution. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Letter from plaintiff Stanley Tyler regarding being transferred and if case could be sped up. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Letter from Plaintiff Tyler Stanley requesting court order to obtain HSU/dental files. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Letter / Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff Tyler Stanley. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Letter from Clerk's Office to plaintiff regarding settlement letters, and in response to #18 confirmation request. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Letter from plaintiff regarding an inmate who may send a filing to the court in plaintiff's name. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Letter from plaintiff requesting confirmation of initial partial payment. (Attachments: #1 Disbursement request) (jef),(ps) Modified filing date on 2/11/2019 (jef). (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Letter from Plaintiff Tyler Stanley re: initial partial payment. No response needed, $4.38 initial partial payment received on 2/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Interview/Information Request, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 4.38, receipt number 34690033784. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Defendants. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Tyler Stanley. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Declaration of Nate A. Lindell filed by Plaintiff Tyler Stanley re #6 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Declaration of Tyler Stanley re #6 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Tyler Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Adult Conduct Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Inmate Placed in Temporary Lockup) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 4.38 assessed due 2/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/11/2019. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Tyler Stanley. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (rks). (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tyler Stanley. (rks),(ps) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tyler Stanley. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-9 - Inmate Complaint, Interview/Information Requests, Health Service Requests, Psychological Service Request, #2 Cover Letter) (rks) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.