This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2021 at 09:22:59 (UTC).

Virgil Stanley et al v. Bellflower Unified School District et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Virgil Stanley filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Bellflower Unified School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05054

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deserie Stanley

V. S.

Virgil Stanley

Defendants

Bellflower Unified School District

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Omar M Naime

Attorney at Liu and Naime

145 South Spring Street Suite 850

Los Angeles, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Declaration Declaration in Support of GAL

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Bellflower Unified School District. (yl) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs V. S., Deserie Stanley, Virgil Stanley. (Naime, Omar) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR EX PARTE APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF V.S. #7 , #8 by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. It is ORDERED that Virgil Stanley shall be appointed as guardian ad litem for V.S. in the above captioned action. (hr) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PETITION for Appointment of Virgil Stanley as Guardian ad Litem for V.S. filed by Plaintiffs V. S., Virgil Stanley. (Naime, Omar) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PETITION for Appointment of Virgil Stanley as Guardian ad Litem for V.S. filed by Plaintiffs V. S., Virgil Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of GAL) (Naime, Omar) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: It appears a guardian ad litem is named in this case but no Petition seeking such appointment has been filed. A Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem must be filed when the appointment of a guardian ad litem is required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c)(2). See Local Rule 17-1. Counsel must file a Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs V. S., Deserie Stanley, Virgil Stanley, (Naime, Omar) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs V. S., Deserie Stanley, Virgil Stanley. (Naime, Omar) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31502792 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Stanley, V. S., Deserie Stanley. (Attorney Omar M Naime added to party V. S.(pty:pla), Attorney Omar M Naime added to party Deserie Stanley(pty:pla), Attorney Omar M Naime added to party Virgil Stanley(pty:pla))(Naime, Omar) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant