This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 07:36:35 (UTC).

Brianna Stanko et al v. John McCorvey, III et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Brianna Stanko filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against John McCorvey, III. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00195

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brianna Stanko

Petitioners

Resin Corporation, a Delaware corporation, formerly known as Elevate Brands, LLC

Elevate Brands, LLC

Defendants

William Uicker

Elevate Brands LLC

John McCorvey

John McCorvey, III

Does 1-25

Resin Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Lee Hitzke

Attorney at Hitzke and Ferran LLP

100 Oceangate Suite 1100

Long Beach, CA 90802

Cassandra Alexander

Attorney at Hitzke and Ferran LLP

100 Oceangate, Suite 1100

Long Beach, CA 90802

Jessica Sprague

Attorney at Hitzke and Ferran LLP

100 Oceangate, Suite 1100

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Brianna Stanko. Dismissal is with. (Hitzke, Daniel) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of the entire action #10 , and hereby orders the case dismissed with prejudice. Further, the Court orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Brianna Stanko. Dismissal is without. (Hitzke, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Lee Hitzke counsel for Plaintiff Brianna Stanko. Jessica Sprague, Esq. is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Brianna Stanko. (Hitzke, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Lee Hitzke counsel for Plaintiff Brianna Stanko. Cassandra Alexander, Esq. is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Brianna Stanko. (Hitzke, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge John F. Walter, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 8:20-cv-00779 JFW(ADSx) (rn) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brianna Stanko, (Hitzke, Daniel) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brianna Stanko. (Hitzke, Daniel) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30296660 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Brianna Stanko. (Attorney Daniel Lee Hitzke added to party Brianna Stanko(pty:pla))(Hitzke, Daniel) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Resin Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Lee Hitzke