This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2021 at 07:31:58 (UTC).

STANISCI v. Xilinx, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2021 STANISCI filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Xilinx, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01108

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULES STANISCI

Defendants

Ronald S. Jankov

Jon A. Olson

Xilinx, Inc.

Thomas H. Lee

Saar Gillai

Victor Peng

Elizabeth Vanderslice

Mary Louise Krakauer

Dennis Segers

Raman Chitkara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Eldridge Bower

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Affidavit PSLRA Cert

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by JULES STANISCI. Service waived by Xilinx, Inc. waiver sent on 3/16/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Bower, David) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15574924.). Filed byJULES STANISCI. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit PSLRA Cert, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Bower, David) (Filed on 2/13/2021) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less