This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2020 at 07:04:21 (UTC).

Stanford v. General Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 Stanford filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against General Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-06382

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Athena Stanford

Defendant

General Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janine Crystal Ogando

Attorney at Ogando Law Offices

47 Muth Drive

Orinda, CA 94563

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Justin Boos

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Corban James Porter

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning and Berman

1401 Willow Pass Rd Ste 700

Concord, CA 94520

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria finding as moot #13 Motion to Remand; denying #14 Amended Motion to Remand. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#24

(#24) ORDER TO REFILE EXHIBITS IN ACCORDANCE WITH STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/25/2020. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2020) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

#23

(#23) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Declaration amended declaration of Janine Ogando

#14

(#18) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 Amended MOTION to Remand ) filed byGeneral Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Corban J. Porter in support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Porter, Corban) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

13 #3

[Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Remand to State Court

13 #2

Declaration of Ogando in Support of Motion

13 #1

Supplement Memornadum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion

#13

(#26) ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria finding as moot #13 Motion to Remand; denying #14 Amended Motion to Remand. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

7 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant General Insurance

#7

#Electronic filing error. Proposed order required in accordance with L.R. 5-1(g). Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by General Insurance Company of America (jmlS, COURT STAFF ) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by General Insurance Company of America.. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by General Insurance Company of America. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#2

#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by General Insurance Company of America (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

#Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: JANINE C. OGANDO. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Insurance Company of America (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria finding as moot #13 Motion to Remand; denying #14 Amended Motion to Remand. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket(#25) CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the motion hearing scheduled for 11/5/2020, re Motion to Remand. The Court will issue a written ruling based on the motion and responsive briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER TO REFILE EXHIBITS IN ACCORDANCE WITH STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/25/2020. (vclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2020) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 10/23/2020) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Refund Status re #20 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY (re #14 Amended MOTION to Remand ) filed byAthena Stanford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ogando Dec iso attorney fees, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order granting fees and remand)(Ogando, Janine) (Filed on 10/21/2020) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14927025 by General Insurance Company of America. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/20/2020) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint of Athena Stanford against General Insurance Company of America. Filed byAthena Stanford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G to 1st amended complaint)(Ogando, Janine) (Filed on 10/20/2020) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 Amended MOTION to Remand ) filed byGeneral Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Corban J. Porter in support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Porter, Corban) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Athena Stanford. (Ogando, Janine) (Filed on 10/5/2020) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Proposed order required in accordance with L.R. 5-1(g). Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by General Insurance Company of America (jmlS, COURT STAFF ) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Causes of Action for Intentional and Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress filed by General Insurance Company of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2020 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/1/2020. Replies due by 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant General Insurance Company of America to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Causes of Action for Intentional and Negligent Infliction of Emotional Stress)(Porter, Corban) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by General Insurance Company of America (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: JANINE C. OGANDO. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Insurance Company of America (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by General Insurance Company of America.. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by General Insurance Company of America. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by General Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation for General Insurance Company of America. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Alameda County. Their case number is RG20065613. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14927059). Filed byGeneral Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Insurance Company Of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corban James Porter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Justin Boos