This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2021 at 05:26:29 (UTC).

Stanford Health Care v. USABLE Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Stanford Health Care filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against USABLE Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Phyllis J. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00550

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Phyllis J. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanford Health Care

Defendants

USABLE Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield

USABLE Mutual Insurance Company an Arkansas insurance company doing business as Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Jiao

Attorney at Law Offices of Stephenson, Acquisto, and Coleman, Inc

303 N Gleanoaks Blvd, 7Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91502

Karlene Jasmine Rogers-Aberman

Attorney at Law Offices Stephenson, Acquisto & Colman, Inc.

303 North Glenoaks Boulevard, Suite 700

Burbank, CA 91502

David Frank Mastan

Attorney at Stephenson, Acquisto and Colman

303 N. Glenoaks Blvd, Ste. 700

Burbank, CA 91502

Joy Stephenson-Laws

Attorney at Law Offices of Stephenson Acquisto & Colman, Inc.

303 N. Glenoaks Blvd., Suite 700

Burbank, CA 91502-3226

Richard Alan Lovich

Attorney at Law Offices of Stephenson Acquisto & Colman, Inc.

303 N. Glenoaks Boulevard, Suite 700

Burbank, CA 91502

Defendant Attorney

Michael A. Naranjo

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

555 California Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104-1520

 

Court Documents

#29

28 #1

Proposed Order (Proposed) Order

#28

#27

26 #1

Declaration Declaration of Jennifer Jiao

24 #3

Proposed Order

24 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashleigh Phillips

24 #1

Declaration of Ashleigh Phillips

#24

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the hearing on #24 Motion to Dismiss is continued to 7/1/2021 at 1:30 p.m. to be heard with #28 Motion to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2021 at 01:30 PM - Videoconference Only before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Related documents(s) #24 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 MOTION to Strike Declarations of Jennifer Jiao and Antonio Fonseca ) filed byStanford Health Care. (Jiao, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/8/2021) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Strike Declarations of Jennifer Jiao and Antonio Fonseca filed by USABLE Mutual Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 6/8/2021. Replies due by 6/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order)(Naranjo, Michael) (Filed on 5/25/2021) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY (re #24 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byUSABLE Mutual Insurance Company. (Naranjo, Michael) (Filed on 5/25/2021) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION to Dismiss), filed by Stanford Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer Jiao, #2 Declaration Declaration of Antonio Fonseca, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer Jiao)(Jiao, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/18/2021) Modified on 5/19/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Notice of Withdrawal of #21 Motion to Dismiss Complaint, filed by USABLE Mutual Insurance Company (Naranjo, Michael) (Filed on 5/10/2021) Modified on 5/11/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Dismiss filed by USABLE Mutual Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 5/18/2021. Replies due by 5/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashleigh Phillips, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashleigh Phillips, #3 Proposed Order)(Naranjo, Michael) (Filed on 5/4/2021) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT against USABLE Mutual Insurance Company. Filed by Stanford Health Care. (Jiao, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/20/2021) Modified on 4/21/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#22) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on July 15, 2021 at 2:00 P.M., via Zoom Webinar, the HONORABLE PHYLLIS J. HAMILTON will conduct the Initial Case Management Conference. previously noticed for May 20, 2021, in this matter. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by USABLE Mutual Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 4/28/2021. Replies due by 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashleigh Phillips, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashleigh Phillips, #3 Proposed Order)(Naranjo, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to USABLE Mutual Insurance Company. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. (Jiao, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disregard document contains Errors, filer will resubmit corrected summons- Summons Issued as to USABLE Mutual Insurance Company. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021) Modified on 1/28/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. (Jiao, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disregard, document contains errors filer will resubmit corrected summons- Proposed Summons. (Jiao, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/26/2021) Modified on 1/27/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]The correct event is Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents, Proposed Summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Stanford Health Care (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/8/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Stanford Health Care as to USABLE Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield. (Jiao, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/22/2021) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against USABLE Mutual Insurance Company d/b/a Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15480989.). Filed byStanford Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jiao, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/22/2021) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAble Mutual Insurance Co is a litigant

Latest cases where STANFORD HEALTH CARE A NONPROFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant