Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/21/2021 at 20:08:23 (UTC).

Stanford Health Care v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Stanford Health Care filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-04598

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanford Health Care

300 Pasteur Drive

Stanford, CA 94305

Defendant

Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

William E. von Behren

Attorney at VON BEHREN & HUNTER LLP

2041 Rosecrans Ave., Suite 367

El Segundo, CA 90245

Carol Burney Lewis

Attorney at VON BEHREN & HUNTER LLP

2041 Rosecrans Ave., Suite 367

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc.. (Lewis, Carol) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc. for Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (von Behren, William) (Filed on 6/15/2021) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

1 #9

Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service of Removal

1 #8

Declaration Re Removal

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Federal CCCS

1 #6

Exhibit A-6 Notice of Removal State Court

1 #5

Exhibit A-5 Notice of Civil Law Suit

1 #4

Exhibit A-4 Complaint (State)

1 #3

Exhibit A-3 Summons (State)

1 #2

Exhibit A-2 Civil Case Cover Sheet (State)

1 #1

Exhibit A-1 Notice of Acknowledgement

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 21CV381561. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16078509). Filed byBlue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Notice of Acknowledgement, #2 Exhibit A-2 Civil Case Cover Sheet (State), #3 Exhibit A-3 Summons (State), #4 Exhibit A-4 Complaint (State), #5 Exhibit A-5 Notice of Civil Law Suit, #6 Exhibit A-6 Notice of Removal State Court, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Federal CCCS, #8 Declaration Re Removal, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service of Removal)(Lewis, Carol) (Filed on 6/15/2021) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc.. (Lewis, Carol) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/29/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc. for Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (von Behren, William) (Filed on 6/15/2021) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 21CV381561. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16078509). Filed byBlue Cross Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Notice of Acknowledgement, #2 Exhibit A-2 Civil Case Cover Sheet (State), #3 Exhibit A-3 Summons (State), #4 Exhibit A-4 Complaint (State), #5 Exhibit A-5 Notice of Civil Law Suit, #6 Exhibit A-6 Notice of Removal State Court, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Federal CCCS, #8 Declaration Re Removal, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service of Removal)(Lewis, Carol) (Filed on 6/15/2021) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina is a litigant

Latest cases where STANFORD HEALTH CARE A NONPROFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carol Burney Lewis