This case was last updated from PACER on 05/17/2021 at 07:22:21 (UTC).

Standard Fabrics International, Inc. v. Kohls Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Standard Fabrics International, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Kohls Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02423

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Standard Fabrics International, Inc.

Defendants

Kohl s Corporation

Beall's, Inc.

Does 1-10

R & R Goldman & Associates, Inc. an Illinois corporation doing business as Discovery Clothing Company

Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation

Ross Stores, Inc.

Citi Trends, Inc.

Gabriel Brothers, Inc.

Walmart Inc.

Forman Mills, Inc.

Meijer, Inc.

United Fashions of Texas, LLC

The TJX Companies, Inc.

Macy's Inc.,

Macys Inc.

Bealls, Inc.

Kohls Corporation

R and R Goldman and Associates, Inc. an Illinois corporation doing business as Discovery Clothing Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A. Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Trevor William Barrett

Attorney at Doninger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Stephen M. Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. upon The TJX Companies, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Todd M. Lander, Attorney. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. upon Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; Citi Trends, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; Gabriel Brothers, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; Meijer, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; Ross Stores, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; United Fashions of Texas, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; Walmart Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Yvette J. Sutton, Attorney. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#11

(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (vv) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge R. Gary Klausner, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-01633 RGK(KSx) (rn) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Bealls, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Citi Trends, Inc., Forman Mills, Inc., Gabriel Brothers, Inc., Kohls Corporation, Macys Inc., Meijer, Inc., R and R Goldman and Associates, Inc., Ross Stores, Inc., The TJX Companies, Inc., United Fashions of Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-05982-GW-KS (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30946223 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party Standard Fabrics International, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. upon The TJX Companies, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Todd M. Lander, Attorney. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. upon Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; Citi Trends, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; Gabriel Brothers, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; Meijer, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; Ross Stores, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; United Fashions of Texas, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021; Walmart Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Yvette J. Sutton, Attorney. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (vv) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge R. Gary Klausner, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-01633 RGK(KSx) (rn) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Bealls, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Citi Trends, Inc., Forman Mills, Inc., Gabriel Brothers, Inc., Kohls Corporation, Macys Inc., Meijer, Inc., R and R Goldman and Associates, Inc., Ross Stores, Inc., The TJX Companies, Inc., United Fashions of Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-05982-GW-KS (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30946223 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Standard Fabrics International, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party Standard Fabrics International, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Forman Mills Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where United Fashions of Texas is a litigant

Latest cases where Beall's, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where R & R Goldman & Associates, Inc. is a litigant