This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/18/2019 at 07:59:22 (UTC).

Standard Construction Company v. Okland Construction Company Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 Standard Construction Company filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Okland Construction Company Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04504

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Standard Construction Company Incorporated

Defendants

Okland Construction Company Incorporated

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert F Roos

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP - Phoenix Office

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1-3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Summons

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Summons

#7

#8

#9

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Standard Construction Company Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 7/3/19 to Okland Construction Company, Inc. . (Roos, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Construction Company Incorporated. (Roos, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/20/2019. (MMO) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (KAH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Standard Construction Company Incorporated. (KAH) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17066975. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04504-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Standard Construction Company Incorporated. (Roos, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KAH) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17066975 filed by Standard Construction Company Incorporated. (Roos, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAH) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OKLAND CONSTRUCTION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant