This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2020 at 07:49:29 (UTC).

Stanard v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Stanard filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee Yeakel and Mark Lane. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01211

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

Referral Judge

Mark Lane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Andrew Stanard

Defendant

JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Gannon Helstowski

Attorney at J Gannon Helstowski Law Firm

13601 Preston Road, Suite E920

Dallas, TX 75240

Defendant Attorneys

William Lance Lewis

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser, PC

2001 Bryan St., Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Eric G. Carlson

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett and Moser PC

2001 Bryan St Ste 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Carlson, Eric) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Carlson, Eric) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Carlson, Eric) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12964516), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

6 #1

Proposed Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Carlson, Eric) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Carlson, Eric) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Charles Andrew Stanard. (cj) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Carlson, Eric) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12964516), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.