This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 11:12:24 (UTC).

Staley v. Arch Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Staley filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Arch Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02223

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chance Staley

Defendants

Arch Insurance Company

Out of Towne, LLC doing business as Red Sky Travel Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher David Lindstrom

Attorney at Potts Law Firm LLP-Houston

3737 Buffalo Speedway, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

Coleman Thomas Lechner

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP-Denver

600 17Th Street, Suite 2020S

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and to Continue Court Scheduled Deadlines by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Lechner, Coleman) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Coleman Thomas Lechner on behalf of Arch Insurance CompanyAttorney Coleman Thomas Lechner added to party Arch Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lechner, Coleman) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 by Plaintiff Chance Staley. (Lindstrom, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit

8 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company, Out of Towne, LLC, filed by Chance Staley.(Lindstrom, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/31/20 returnable by Plaintiff, as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 8/14/2020. (nmarb, ) Modified on 8/21/2020 to as DISCHARGED pursuant to 10 Minute Order. (nmarb, ). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#5

(#5) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Arch Insurance Company & Out of Towne by Plaintiff Chance Staley. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Lindstrom, Christopher) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted is incomplete and not issued. Attorneys are not allowed to issue summonses pursuant to Fed. Civ. Rule 4. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company, Out of Towne, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7407976)Attorney Christopher David Lindstrom added to party Chance Staley(pty:dft), filed by Chance Staley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lindstrom, Christopher) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/26/2020. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before 11/6/2020. All other deadlines REMAIN SET. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and to Continue Court Scheduled Deadlines by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Lechner, Coleman) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Coleman Thomas Lechner on behalf of Arch Insurance CompanyAttorney Coleman Thomas Lechner added to party Arch Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lechner, Coleman) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/20/2020. Upon review of the #7 Amended Complaint and the #9 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Chance Staley, the court is satisfied that complete diversity exists among the Parties and therefore DISCHARGES the #6 Order to Show Cause. Furthermore, the Parties shall complete and file the Consent Form by 10/6/2020, and a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/20/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. Finally, Plaintiff shall promptly notify the court should this civil action be transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #6 by Plaintiff Chance Staley. (Lindstrom, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Chance Staley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lindstrom, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company, Out of Towne, LLC, filed by Chance Staley.(Lindstrom, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/31/20 returnable by Plaintiff, as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 8/14/2020. (nmarb, ) Modified on 8/21/2020 to as DISCHARGED pursuant to 10 Minute Order. (nmarb, ). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Arch Insurance Company & Out of Towne by Plaintiff Chance Staley. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Lindstrom, Christopher) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted is incomplete and not issued. Attorneys are not allowed to issue summonses pursuant to Fed. Civ. Rule 4. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Arch Insurance Company, Out of Towne, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7407976)Attorney Christopher David Lindstrom added to party Chance Staley(pty:dft), filed by Chance Staley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lindstrom, Christopher) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less