This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:28:33 (UTC).

Staine v. Stanford et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Staine against Stanford in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-01040

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Christian F. Hummel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Staine

Defendants

Ellen E. Alexander

Tina M. Stanford

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Staine. (Mailing envelope included)(meb) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

1 #1

Cover Letter and Mailing Envelope

#4

(#4) ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. Plaintiff's IFP application is DENIED as incomplete. Because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. If plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, (1) either (a) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full, or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application; AND (2) submit a completed and signed inmate authorization form. Upon plaintiff's compliance with this Order, the Clerk shall reopen the action and forward it to the Court for review. In accordance with the Rule 10.1(c)(2) of the Court's Local Rules, plaintiff shall promptly notify the Clerk's Office and all parties or their counsel, in writing, of any change in his address. Plaintiff's failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/28/2019. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#6

(#6) INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM filed by Eric Staine. (Mailing envelope included) (meb) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#9

(#9) Letter Motion dated 9/23/2019 for injunctive relief filed by Eric Staine. (Mailing envelope included) (meb) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#8

(#8) DECISION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application (Dkt. No. #5 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to provide the Superintendent of the facility, designated by Plaintiff as his current location, with a copy of Plaintiff's authorization form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide a copy of Plaintiff's inmate authorization form to the Financial Deputy of the Clerk's Office. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must file an Amended Complaint as set forth herein within thirty (30) days from the date of the filing of this Decision and Order. If Plaintiff timely files an Amended Complaint, this matter be returned to the Court for further review. If Plaintiff fails to timely file an Amended Complaint as directed above, the Clerk shall enter judgment indicating this action is DISMISSED without prejudice without further order of this Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and for failure to comply with this Decision and Order. In that event, the Clerk is directed to close this case. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. No. #3 ) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/24/2019. (Notice of Compliance Deadline 10/24/2019, Case Review Deadline 11/25/2019). (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail, together with original #1 Complaint). (sal) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Eric Staine. (meb) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ellen E. Alexander, Tina M. Stanford filed by Eric Staine. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Mailing Envelope)(meb) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Staine.(meb) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter Motion dated 9/23/2019 for injunctive relief filed by Eric Staine. (Mailing envelope included) (meb) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notification to Superintendent of Filing - Provided Superintendent at Mohawk Correctional Facility with notice of instant action and a copy of Plaintiff's #6 Inmate Authorization Form. USDC/NYND Finance Dept notified. (sal ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DECISION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application (Dkt. No. #5 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to provide the Superintendent of the facility, designated by Plaintiff as his current location, with a copy of Plaintiff's authorization form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide a copy of Plaintiff's inmate authorization form to the Financial Deputy of the Clerk's Office. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must file an Amended Complaint as set forth herein within thirty (30) days from the date of the filing of this Decision and Order. If Plaintiff timely files an Amended Complaint, this matter be returned to the Court for further review. If Plaintiff fails to timely file an Amended Complaint as directed above, the Clerk shall enter judgment indicating this action is DISMISSED without prejudice without further order of this Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and for failure to comply with this Decision and Order. In that event, the Clerk is directed to close this case. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. No. #3 ) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/24/2019. (Notice of Compliance Deadline 10/24/2019, Case Review Deadline 11/25/2019). (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail, together with original #1 Complaint). (sal) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • (#7) TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/9/2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(meb) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM filed by Eric Staine. (Mailing envelope included) (meb) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Staine. (Mailing envelope included)(meb) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. Plaintiff's IFP application is DENIED as incomplete. Because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. If plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, (1) either (a) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full, or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application; AND (2) submit a completed and signed inmate authorization form. Upon plaintiff's compliance with this Order, the Clerk shall reopen the action and forward it to the Court for review. In accordance with the Rule 10.1(c)(2) of the Court's Local Rules, plaintiff shall promptly notify the Clerk's Office and all parties or their counsel, in writing, of any change in his address. Plaintiff's failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/28/2019. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Eric Staine. (meb) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Staine.(meb) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ellen E. Alexander, Tina M. Stanford filed by Eric Staine. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Mailing Envelope)(meb) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.