This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2021 at 10:47:12 (UTC).

STADER v. PENCE

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 STADER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PENCE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03136

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELODY STADER

Defendant

GREG PENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth J. Falk

Attorney at ACLU OF INDIANA

1031 E. Washington Street

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Defendant Attorneys

Todd B. Tatelman

Attorney at OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Sarah Clouse

Attorney at OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Douglas Letter

Attorney at OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Acknowledgement of Dismissal - The parties having filed their #23 Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Case without Prejudice, and the Court having read the Stipulation acknowledges that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this matter has been DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/4/2021.(NAD) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#23

(#23) STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice, as to Defendant GREG PENCE, filed by MELODY STADER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#22

(#22) ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that due to the settlement of this matter, the parties are relieved of the requirement that they jointly propose a briefing schedule on or before January 29, 2021, and, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that papers dismissing this action shall be filed within 30 days of this date. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/28/2021.(NAD) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#21

(#21) STATUS REPORT and Motion to Relieve Parties of Proposing Briefing Schedule (JOINT) by MELODY STADER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#20

(#20) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 1/14/2021. The parties' Joint Motion to Set Date for Status Report (Docket No. #17 ) is GRANTED. The parties' joint status report and a joint proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. #5 ) shall be filed on or before January 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

(#17) REPORT and Motion to Set Date for Status Report - Joint by MELODY STADER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth) Modified on 1/11/2021 - edited for administrative purposes(NAD). (Entered: 01/09/2021)

#6

(#6) ENTRY DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #5 ). Parties are to meet with Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman to discuss a discovery plan, briefing schedule, and to determine a date for the hearing on preliminary injunctive relief, as well as the estimated time required for such hearing. Counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/21/2020.(NAD) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#20) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 1/14/2021. The parties' Joint Motion to Set Date for Status Report (Docket No. #17 ) is GRANTED. The parties' joint status report and a joint proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. #5 ) shall be filed on or before January 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to GREG PENCE. (AKH) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Falk on behalf of Plaintiff MELODY STADER. (Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against GREG PENCE, filed by MELODY STADER. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6307784) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Acknowledgement of Dismissal - The parties having filed their #23 Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Case without Prejudice, and the Court having read the Stipulation acknowledges that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this matter has been DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/4/2021.(NAD) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice, as to Defendant GREG PENCE, filed by MELODY STADER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that due to the settlement of this matter, the parties are relieved of the requirement that they jointly propose a briefing schedule on or before January 29, 2021, and, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that papers dismissing this action shall be filed within 30 days of this date. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/28/2021.(NAD) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STATUS REPORT and Motion to Relieve Parties of Proposing Briefing Schedule (JOINT) by MELODY STADER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 1/14/2021. The parties' Joint Motion to Set Date for Status Report (Docket No. #17 ) is GRANTED. The parties' joint status report and a joint proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. #5 ) shall be filed on or before January 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Clouse on behalf of Defendant GREG PENCE. (Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPORT and Motion to Set Date for Status Report - Joint by MELODY STADER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth) Modified on 1/11/2021 - edited for administrative purposes(NAD). (Entered: 01/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER - The above case is hereby assigned for a TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE on JANUARY 14, 2021 at 11:00 a.m., Indianapolis time (EST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed by counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/8/2021.(AAS) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Letter on behalf of Defendant GREG PENCE. (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd B. Tatelman on behalf of Defendant GREG PENCE. (Tatelman, Todd) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELODY STADER. (Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELODY STADER. GREG PENCE served on 12/18/2020. (Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff MELODY STADER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Melody Stader)(Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE Concerning Service, filed by Plaintiff MELODY STADER (Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #5 ). Parties are to meet with Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman to discuss a discovery plan, briefing schedule, and to determine a date for the hearing on preliminary injunctive relief, as well as the estimated time required for such hearing. Counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/21/2020.(NAD) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff MELODY STADER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to GREG PENCE. (AKH) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Falk on behalf of Plaintiff MELODY STADER. (Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against GREG PENCE, filed by MELODY STADER. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6307784) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Edith Clouse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Barry Tatelman Esq.