This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 13:30:34 (UTC).

Stacker v. Focus Workforce Management, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Stacker filed an Other lawsuit against Focus Workforce Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Angel D. Mitchell and John W. Broomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02241

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Angel D. Mitchell

Presiding Judge

John W. Broomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pra'shawna Stacker

Defendant

Focus Workforce Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jayson A. Watkins

Attorney at Brown and Watkins LLC

301 S. Us 169 Highway

Gower, MO 64454

Charles Jason Brown

Attorney at Brown and Watkins LLC

301 S. Us 169 Highway

Gower, MO 64454

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer M. Hannah

Attorney at Lathrop GPM, LLP - Kansas City

2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2618

Elizabeth Duff Mendoza

Attorney at Lathrop GPM, LLP - Kansas City

2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2618

Bridget B. Romero

Attorney at Lathrop GPM, LLP - Kansas City

2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2618

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Focus Workforce Management, Inc.. (Romero, Bridget) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Focus Workforce Management, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Romero, Bridget) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Focus Workforce Management, Inc..(Romero, Bridget) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#6

(#6) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 03:30 PM by Telephone (ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 6/23/2020. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/7/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/11/2020. (jal) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#5

(#5) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/19/2020 for Defendant Focus Workforce Management, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/4/2020. (ca) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Pra'shawna Stacker upon Focus Workforce Management, Inc. served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020 (Brown, Charles) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#3

(#3) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jayson A. Watkins on behalf of Pra'shawna Stacker. (Watkins, Jayson) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Pra'shawna Stacker. (Brown, Charles) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5139500.), filed by Pra'shawna Stacker.(Brown, Charles) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Focus Workforce Management, Inc.. (Romero, Bridget) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Focus Workforce Management, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Romero, Bridget) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Focus Workforce Management, Inc..(Romero, Bridget) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 03:30 PM by Telephone (ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 6/23/2020. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/7/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/11/2020. (jal) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/19/2020 for Defendant Focus Workforce Management, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/4/2020. (ca) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Pra'shawna Stacker upon Focus Workforce Management, Inc. served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020 (Brown, Charles) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Focus Workforce Management, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jayson A. Watkins on behalf of Pra'shawna Stacker. (Watkins, Jayson) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Pra'shawna Stacker. (Brown, Charles) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5139500.), filed by Pra'shawna Stacker.(Brown, Charles) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less