This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/22/2019 at 07:27:29 (UTC).

STABILE v. II-VI INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 STABILE filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against II-VI INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Mitchell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00062

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS STABILE

Defendants

JOSEPH J. CORASANTI

VINCENT D. MATTERA, JR.

MARC Y.E. PELAEZ

WILLIAM SCHROMM

SHAKER SADASIVAM

MARY JANE RAYMOND

HOWARD H. XIA

FRANCIS J. KRAMER

ENRICO DIGIROLAMO

II-VI INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alfred G. Yates, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Alfred G. Yates, Jr.

300 Mount Lebanon Boulevard, Suite 206B

Pittsburgh, PA 15234

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal The Court shall retain continuing jurisdiction over the parties to the Action for purposes of any potential further proceedings related to the adjudication of any claim by Plaintiff for attorneys fees and/or expenses. by THOMAS STABILE (Yates, Alfred) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to JOSEPH J. CORASANTI, ENRICO DIGIROLAMO, II-VI INCORPORATED, VINCENT D. MATTERA, JR, MARC Y.E. PELAEZ, MARY JANE RAYMOND, SHAKER SADASIVAM, WILLIAM SCHROMM, HOWARD H. XIA (sdp) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

1 #2

Shareholder Certification

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOSEPH J. CORASANTI, ENRICO DIGIROLAMO, II-VI INCORPORATED, FRANCIS J. KRAMER, VINCENT D. MATTERA, JR, MARC Y.E. PELAEZ, MARY JANE RAYMOND, SHAKER SADASIVAM, WILLIAM SCHROMM, HOWARD H. XIA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 3315-5000230), filed by THOMAS STABILE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2019: #2 Shareholder Certification) (sdp) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal The Court shall retain continuing jurisdiction over the parties to the Action for purposes of any potential further proceedings related to the adjudication of any claim by Plaintiff for attorneys fees and/or expenses. by THOMAS STABILE (Yates, Alfred) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to JOSEPH J. CORASANTI, ENRICO DIGIROLAMO, II-VI INCORPORATED, VINCENT D. MATTERA, JR, MARC Y.E. PELAEZ, MARY JANE RAYMOND, SHAKER SADASIVAM, WILLIAM SCHROMM, HOWARD H. XIA (sdp) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JOSEPH J. CORASANTI, ENRICO DIGIROLAMO, II-VI INCORPORATED, FRANCIS J. KRAMER, VINCENT D. MATTERA, JR, MARC Y.E. PELAEZ, MARY JANE RAYMOND, SHAKER SADASIVAM, WILLIAM SCHROMM, HOWARD H. XIA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 3315-5000230), filed by THOMAS STABILE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2019: #2 Shareholder Certification) (sdp) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where II-VI INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfred G. Yates, Jr.