This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2021 at 06:53:22 (UTC).

St. Julian Wine Co., Inc., v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 St Julian Wine Co , Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Cincinnati Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent, Paul L. Maloney and Hala Y. Jarbou. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00374

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judges

Paul L. Maloney

Hala Y. Jarbou

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

St. Julian Wine Co., Inc.,

Defendant

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A. Hubbard

Attorney at Hubbard Snitchler & Parzianello

801 W. Ann Arbor Trail, Ste. 240, Mayflower Centre

Plymouth, MI 48170-1694

Matthew Blake Heath

Attorney at M. Blake Heath, Trial Attorney LLC

917 W 43Rd St., Ste. 100

Kansas City, MO 64111

Eric Parzianello

Attorney at Hubbard Snitchler & Parzianello

801 W. Ann Arbor Trail, Ste. 240, Mayflower Centre

Plymouth, MI 48170-1694

Defendant Attorneys

Dennis Michael Dolan

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

303 W Madison St., Ste. 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Bradford S. Moyer

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney (Grand Rapids)

333 Bridge St., Nw, Ste. 530

Grand Rapids, MI 49504

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) JUDGMENT dismissing Plaintiff's complaint; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

20 #17

Exhibit 17

20 #14

Exhibit 14

20 #13

Exhibit 13

20 #12

Exhibit 12

20 #11

Exhibit 11

19 #10

Exhibit 10

19 #5

Exhibit 5

19 #4

Exhibit 4

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Cincinnati Insurance Company filed by St. Julian Wine Co., Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hubbard, John) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; The Cincinnati Insurance Company served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020 (Hubbard, John) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company (pjw) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Julian Wine Co., Inc., (Parzianello, Eric) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (pjw) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Hubbard, John) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Hubbard, John) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) JUDGMENT dismissing Plaintiff's complaint; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #11 motion to dismiss; granting #18 motion to cite new authority; granting #19 motion to cite new authority; granting #20 motion to supplement; granting #21 motion to supplement; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) OPINION; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) FOURTH MOTION for leave to submit supplemental authority by defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Dolan, Dennis) Modified text on 3/19/2021 (jem). (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) THIRD MOTION for leave to submit supplemental authority by defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19) (Dolan, Dennis) Modified text on 3/2/2021 (pjw) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SECOND MOTION to cite new authority SECOND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15) (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to cite new authority Motion For Leave To Submit Supplemental Authority by defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Dolan, Dennis) Modified text on 10/16/2020 (jem). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071 ; District Judge Paul L. Maloney is no longer assigned to the case (ndj) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to response to motion #11 filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Dolan, Dennis) Modified text on 9/23/2020 (ems). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #11 filed by St. Julian Wine Co., Inc., (Heath, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020 (Hubbard, John) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Cincinnati Insurance Company filed by St. Julian Wine Co., Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hubbard, John) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; The Cincinnati Insurance Company served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020 (Hubbard, John) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company (pjw) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Julian Wine Co., Inc., (Parzianello, Eric) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (pjw) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eric Parzianello on behalf of plaintiff St. Julian Wine Co., Inc., (Parzianello, Eric) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by attorney John A. Hubbard on behalf of plaintiff, receipt number AMIWDC-5193399; for filing fee (mkc) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Hubbard, John) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against The Cincinnati Insurance Company filed by St. Julian Wine Co., Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hubbard, John) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew B. Heath

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. Hubbard