This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 07:52:34 (UTC).

St. John v. North Shore Home Care LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 St John filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against North Shore Home Care LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01963

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrea St. John

Defendants

North Shore Home Care LLC.

Melody Lynch, individually

North Shore Home Care LLC

Melody Lynch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel David Engelson

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 840

Chicago, IL 60604

John William Billhorn

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 W Jackson Blvd, Suite 1137

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ANDREA ST. JOHN on behalf of herself, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown, v. NORTH SHORE HOME CARE LLC, an Illinois Limited Liability Company and MELODY LYNCH, individually filed by Andrea St. John; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19349709. (Attachments: #1 Consent To Sue - Andrea St. John)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

1 #1

Consent To Sue - Andrea St. John

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrea St. John by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrea St. John by Samuel David Engelson (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Andrea St. John to certify class PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STAGE-ONE CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(b) AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF F.R.C.P. 23 CLASS (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 6/6/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 6/13/2022 at 8:55 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk) (Entered: 05/21/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to unseal the case and regenerate the notice for docket entry #6 to plaintiff's counsel. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/23/2022. Mailed notice (jh, ) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Executed Summons Of Service - Defendant North Shore Home Care, LLC

8 #2

Executed Service Of Summons - Defendant Molody Lynch

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Notice of Filing and Certificate Of Service

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Based on plaintiff's status report, the telephonic status hearing set for 6/13/2022 is vacated and reset to 6/28/2022 at 9:20 a.m., using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order promptly to defendants at the address(es) at which they were served with process in this case. (mk) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Service by Samuel David Engelson on behalf of Andrea St. John regarding terminate hearings,, set/reset hearings, #10 (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of Service by Samuel David Engelson on behalf of Andrea St. John regarding terminate hearings,, set/reset hearings, #10 (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Based on plaintiff's status report, the telephonic status hearing set for 6/13/2022 is vacated and reset to 6/28/2022 at 9:20 a.m., using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order promptly to defendants at the address(es) at which they were served with process in this case. (mk) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS Report Plaintiff's Initial Status Report by Andrea St. John (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing and Certificate Of Service)(Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea St. John as to Melody Lynch on 5/26/2022, answer due 6/16/2022; North Shore Home Care LLC on 5/26/2022, answer due 6/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Executed Summons Of Service - Defendant North Shore Home Care, LLC, #2 Executed Service Of Summons - Defendant Molody Lynch)(Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Melody Lynch, North Shore Home Care LLC (ey, ) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to unseal the case and regenerate the notice for docket entry #6 to plaintiff's counsel. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/23/2022. Mailed notice (jh, ) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 6/6/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 6/13/2022 at 8:55 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk) (Entered: 05/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Andrea St. John to certify class PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STAGE-ONE CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(b) AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY CERTIFICATION OF F.R.C.P. 23 CLASS (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxj, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrea St. John by Samuel David Engelson (Engelson, Samuel) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Andrea St. John by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ANDREA ST. JOHN on behalf of herself, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown, v. NORTH SHORE HOME CARE LLC, an Illinois Limited Liability Company and MELODY LYNCH, individually filed by Andrea St. John; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19349709. (Attachments: #1 Consent To Sue - Andrea St. John)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel David Engelson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John William Billhorn