This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2021 at 12:40:07 (UTC).

St. James Parish School Board v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 St James Parish School Board filed an Other lawsuit against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45034

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

H. D. Smith, LLC doing business as HD Smith formerly known as H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company

Impax Laboratories, LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.

West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.

Walmart Inc.

Allergan Finance LLC

Allergan Limited

McKesson Corporation

Allergan Sales, LLC

Actavis Kadian LLC

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.

Actavis Totowa LLC

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

Actavis Elizabeth LLC

Watson Laboratories, Inc., Florida

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Shannon Marie Jaeckel

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Convention Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Kelly Juneau Rookard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Douglas John Moore

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Natalie J. Dekaris

Attorney at Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

C. William Bradley, Jr.

Attorney at Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

Leland G Horton

Attorney at Bradley Murchison

401 Edwards Street

Shreveport, LA 71101

Richard Munice Crump

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson

201 St. Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Shelley K. Napolitano

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson

201 St. Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Kathryn Marie Knight

Attorney at Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann

909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70112-4042

James Dalton Courson

Attorney at Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann

909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

James A. Brown

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Madison Sharko

Attorney at Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver

2350 L L& E Tower, 909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

Other Attorneys

John F. Olinde

Attorney at Chaffe McCall

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

Walter John Leger, Jr.

Attorney at Leger & Shaw

935 Gravier Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

Glenn Michael Farnet

Attorney at Kean, Miller, Hawthorne, D'Armond, McCowan & Jarman

22Nd Floor, One American Place, P.O. Box 3513

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-3513

Franklin J. Foil

Attorney at Ste. 240

412 N Fourth Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Kerry J. Miller

Attorney at Fishman Haygood - New Orleans

46Th Floor, 201 St. Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Franklin G. Shaw

Attorney at Leger & Shaw

935 Gravier Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

Russell R. Dickson

Attorney at Wiener, Weiss & Madison

330 Marshall Street

Shreveport, LA 71101

Peter J. Rotolo, III

Attorney at Chaffe McCall

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

19 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to McKesson Corporation answer due 5/25/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/26/2021. (ko) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/24/2021. (NEF: Section T)(sbs) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susie Morgan. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(jrc) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Collateral Proceedings. (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:21-cv-00313. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(mm) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Notice (Other). **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kippers, Shannon) Modified text/event on 3/1/2021 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to McKesson Corporation answer due 5/25/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/26/2021. (ko) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/24/2021. (NEF: Section T)(sbs) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text, added link on 2/24/2021 (sbs). [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susie Morgan. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(jrc) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court by St. James Parish School Board. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Landry, Matthew) Modified txt on 2/23/2021 (ajn). [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Collateral Proceedings. (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial District Court, case number 40174 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8732823) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Petition)Attorney Stacey Denise Williams added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H. D. Smith, LLC doing business as HD Smith formerly known as H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where IMPAX Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Pharmaceuticals Incorporated is a litigant