This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/05/2022 at 07:28:20 (UTC).

St. James Parish Public School District v. Juul Labs, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 St James Parish Public School District filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-03983

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

St. James Parish Public School District

Defendants

Juul Labs, Inc.,

Altria Group, Inc.

Altria Client Services, LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Nu Mark LLC

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas R. Farnolo

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC

400 Continental Boulevard, 6Th Floor

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Altria Client Services, LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc.,, Nu Mark LLC, Philip Morris USA, Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by St. James Parish Public School District. Altria Client Services, LLC served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Altria Group Distribution Company served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Altria Group, Inc. served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Juul Labs, Inc., served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Nu Mark LLC served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Philip Morris USA, Inc. served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/11/2022) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by St. James Parish Public School District. Altria Client Services, LLC served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Altria Group Distribution Company served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Altria Group, Inc. served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Juul Labs, Inc., served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Nu Mark LLC served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022; Philip Morris USA, Inc. served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/11/2022) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2913. St. James Parish Public School District v. Juul Labs, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-03983-WHO cc: JPMDL (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Altria Client Services, LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc.,, Nu Mark LLC, Philip Morris USA, Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Farnolo, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Altria Client Services, LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc.,, Nu Mark LLC, Philip Morris USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-17329876.). Filed bySt. James Parish Public School District, St. James Parish, Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farnolo, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/7/2022) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nu Mark LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Philip Morris USA, Inc. is a litigant