This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 08:36:59 (UTC).

St. George Pharmacy Inc. et al v. AmGUARD Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 St George Pharmacy Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AmGUARD Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein and Allyne R. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03763

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James Orenstein

Presiding Judge

Allyne R. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

St. George Pharmacy Inc.

Amal Properties LLC

Defendant

AmGUARD Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roman Rabinovich

Attorney at Wilkofsky, Friedman, Karel & Cummins

299 Broadway, Suite 1700

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorney

Yale Howard Glazer

Attorney at Lazare Potter Giacovas & Moyle LLP

747 Third Avenue, Ste 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE Designating Case To Arbitration and NOTICE Scheduling Arbitration Hearing. Procedures and Instructions for the selection of arbitrator sent to counsel.The Arbitration hearing is scheduled for March 11, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The deadline to select the Arbitrator is January 11, 2021. Counsel will select the Arbitrator from the Courts Panel of Arbitrators found at:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Arbitration/displayAllArb.cfm?geo=&specialtyMult=21In preparation for the arbitration hearing counsel will review the EDNY REMOTE GUIDELINES FOR ARBITRATION PARTICIPANTS included with this notice. Counsel will submit the fully executed Stipulation for Selection of Arbitrator by email to the Arbitration Coordinator: Rita Credle at: rita_credle@nyed.uscourts.gov. (Credle, Rita) (Credle, Rita) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: September 14, 2020. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: October 2, 2020. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: December 31, 2020. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): February 16, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Fact discovery to be completed by: March 30, 2021. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by: April 30, 2021. Defendant's expert disclosures due by: May 28, 2021. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: May 28, 2021. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): June 14, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: June 28, 2021. Joint pretrial order due by: July 26, 2021. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/14/2020. (Orenstein, James) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#8

(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein: Initial Conference Hearing held by telephone on 9/14/2020. Scheduling: (1) The next status conference will be held on February 16, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. (2) A pretrial conference will be held on June 21, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Summary: The plaintiff has no procedural objection to the removal of the case to this court. I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. (Orenstein, James) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#7

(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Initial Disclosure Questionnaire (Rabinovich, Roman) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to attend an initial discovery planning conference on September 14, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. that will take place telephonically. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 391-4302. I respectfully direct all counsel to call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. If any party has any difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. No later than September 10, 2020, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/31/2020. (Almonte, Kelly) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Glazer, Yale) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmGUARD Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent WestGUARD Insurance Company for AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Glazer, Yale) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Process and Pleadings from Removed Action

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmGUARD Insurance Company from New York State Supreme Court, County of Richmond, case number 150786/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13228781) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Process and Pleadings from Removed Action) (Glazer, Yale) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE Designating Case To Arbitration and NOTICE Scheduling Arbitration Hearing. Procedures and Instructions for the selection of arbitrator sent to counsel.The Arbitration hearing is scheduled for March 11, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The deadline to select the Arbitrator is January 11, 2021. Counsel will select the Arbitrator from the Courts Panel of Arbitrators found at:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Arbitration/displayAllArb.cfm?geo=&specialtyMult=21In preparation for the arbitration hearing counsel will review the EDNY REMOTE GUIDELINES FOR ARBITRATION PARTICIPANTS included with this notice. Counsel will submit the fully executed Stipulation for Selection of Arbitrator by email to the Arbitration Coordinator: Rita Credle at: rita_credle@nyed.uscourts.gov. (Credle, Rita) (Credle, Rita) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: September 14, 2020. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: October 2, 2020. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: December 31, 2020. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): February 16, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Fact discovery to be completed by: March 30, 2021. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by: April 30, 2021. Defendant's expert disclosures due by: May 28, 2021. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: May 28, 2021. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): June 14, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: June 28, 2021. Joint pretrial order due by: July 26, 2021. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/14/2020. (Orenstein, James) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein: Initial Conference Hearing held by telephone on 9/14/2020. Scheduling: (1) The next status conference will be held on February 16, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. (2) A pretrial conference will be held on June 21, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Summary: The plaintiff has no procedural objection to the removal of the case to this court. I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. (Orenstein, James) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Initial Disclosure Questionnaire (Rabinovich, Roman) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to attend an initial discovery planning conference on September 14, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. that will take place telephonically. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839 and the access code is 391-4302. I respectfully direct all counsel to call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. If any party has any difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Orenstein_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. No later than September 10, 2020, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/31/2020. (Almonte, Kelly) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Glazer, Yale) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmGUARD Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent WestGUARD Insurance Company for AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Glazer, Yale) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmGUARD Insurance Company from New York State Supreme Court, County of Richmond, case number 150786/2020. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13228781) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Process and Pleadings from Removed Action) (Glazer, Yale) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less