This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 08:23:20 (UTC).

St. Croix Energy, LLLP

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 St Croix Energy, LLLP was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00041

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Appellant

St. Croix Energy, LLLP

In Re

Limetree Bay Services, LLC

Interested Parties

Bay, Ltd.

West Indies Petroleum Ltd. and St. Croix Refining and Transportation, LLLP

The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Limetree Bay Services, LLC, et al. Cases

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Uchechi Angel Egeonuigwe

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Gregg M Galardi

Attorney at Ropes and Gray LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Andrew Devore

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

Uchechi Egeonuigwe

Attorney at Ropes Gray LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

In Re Attorneys

Jimmy Dale Parrish

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

200 S Orange Ave, Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Elizabeth Ann Green

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

200 S Orange Ave, Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Michael T. Delaney

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Jorian L. Rose

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Interested Party Attorneys

Patrick L. Hughes

Attorney at Haynes and Boone LLP

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77010-2007

Jaime B. Leggett

Attorney at Bast Amron LLP

One Se Third Ave, Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33131

Jeffrey P Bast

Attorney at Bast Amron LLP

One Southeast Third Avenue, Suite 1400

Miami, FL 33131

John James Sparacino

Attorney at McKool Smith

600 Travis Street, Suite 7000

Houston, TX 77002

Michael D Warner

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

35 #11

Exhibit K

35 #10

Exhibit J

35 #8

Exhibit H

35 #5

Exhibit E

35 #4

Exhibit D

35 #3

Exhibit C

35 #2

Exhibit B

35 #1

Exhibit A

35 #35

Main Document

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Andrew G. Devore to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Gregg M. Galardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Michael T. Delaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Limetree Bay Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2022. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#5

(#10) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Jorian L. Rose to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#4

(#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Uchechi Egeonuigwe to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#3

(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Andrew G. Devore to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#2

(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Gregg M. Galardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

1 #1

Attachment

#1

(#1) Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 12/30/2021, St. Croix Energy, LLLP filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Lee H Rosenthal, Civil Action 4:22-cv-00041. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 ) (SamanthaWarda, 4) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) JOINDER in #35 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal /Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors Support Of And Joinder To Appellees Motion To Dismiss Appeal Filed By St. Croix Energy LLLP, filed by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Limetree Bay Services, LLC, et al. Cases. (Warner, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 4:21-cv-04187 and Member Case Nos. 4:22-cv-00040, 4:22-cv-00041; granting #36 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Stipulated Order Procedurally Consolidating Appeals and Setting Briefing Schedule (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION for Entry of Order re: Stipulated Order Procedurally Consolidating Appeals and Setting Briefing Schedule by Bay, Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Patrick) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Limetree Bay Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Notice of Docketing an Appeal under Bankruptcy Rule 8018. On 2/8/2022, the appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court, assigned Judge Lee Rosenthal, Civil Action 4:21-cv-41. All appellate filings must now be made in the United States District Court with the civil action caption and case number. Parties notified, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The attached documents represent all designated items to be included as the Record on Appeal in this matter, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2022: #3 Sealed Record) (ShoshanaArnow, 4). (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE Of Closing of Sale by Limetree Bay Services, LLC, filed. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER entered : GRANTING #29 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Extension of Time Closing Deadline Under Sale Order and Asset Purchase Agreement. The deadline for Purchaser to close the Sale transaction under the APA and Sale Order is extended from January 21, 2022 through and including January 24, 2022. Any provisions of the Sale Order requiring the Purchaser to close the transaction under the APA on or before January 21, 2022, including, without limitation, Paragraph 6 of the Sale Order, are hereby amended to extend such date or deadline to January 24, 2022.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) Modified on 1/22/2022 (leddins, 4). Modified on 1/22/2022 (leddins, 4). (Entered: 01/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Limetree Bay Services, LLC, et al./Elizabeth A. Green for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 1/21/2022 before Judge Rosenthal. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas, filed. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION for Extension of Time Closing Deadline Under Sale Order and Asset Purchase Agreement( Motion Docket Date 2/11/2022.) by Limetree Bay Services, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Mark Shapiro)(Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Jorian L. Rose to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Uchechi Egeonuigwe to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Andrew G. Devore to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Gregg M. Galardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Michael T. Delaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Limetree Bay Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2022. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Jorian L. Rose to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Limetree Bay Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2022. (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Uchechi Egeonuigwe to Appear Pro Hac Vice by St. Croix Energy, LLLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2022. (Galardi, Gregg) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Andrew G. Devore to Appear Pro Hac Vice by St. Croix Energy, LLLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2022. (Galardi, Gregg) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Gregg M. Galardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by St. Croix Energy, LLLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2022. (Galardi, Gregg) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 12/30/2021, St. Croix Energy, LLLP filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Lee H Rosenthal, Civil Action 4:22-cv-00041. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 ) (SamanthaWarda, 4) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PS BAY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick L. Hughes