This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2020 at 08:46:40 (UTC).

St. Amand v. Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 St Amand filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01666

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark A. St. Amand

Defendant

James River Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jamie S Cogburn

Attorney at Cogburn Law Offices

2580 St. Rose Parkway, Suite 330

Henderson, NV 89074

Joseph J Troiano

Attorney at Cogburn Law

2580 St. Rose Parkway, Suite 330

Henderson, NV 89074

Defendant Attorneys

Lucian Greco, Jr.

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara LLP

1160 N. Town Center Drive, Suite 250

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Jared G Christensen

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown & Omeara

1160 N Town Center Dr., Ste. 250

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Deleela M. Ivey Weinerman

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown & Omeara

1160 N Town Center Dr., Ste. 250

Las Vegas, NV 89144

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Exhibit Complaint

10 #1

Exhibit Disclosures

#10

(#10) MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Mark A. St. Amand. Responses due by 11/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disclosures, #2 Exhibit Complaint) (Troiano, Joseph) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#9

(#9) Interim STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Mark A. St. Amand. (Troiano, Joseph) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #6 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/14/2021. Motions due by 7/14/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/9/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#6

(#6) Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Mark A. St. Amand. (Troiano, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by James River Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/31/2020.(Weinerman, Deleela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/10/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/25/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James River Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent James River Group Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent James River Group Inc. for James River Insurance Company added. (Weinerman, Deleela) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Weinerman, Deleela) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-819447-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6164365) by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Weinerman, Deleela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/10/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Mark A. St. Amand. Responses due by 11/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disclosures, #2 Exhibit Complaint) (Troiano, Joseph) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Interim STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Mark A. St. Amand. (Troiano, Joseph) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #6 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/14/2021. Motions due by 7/14/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/9/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Mark A. St. Amand. (Troiano, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by James River Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/31/2020.(Weinerman, Deleela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/10/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/25/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James River Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent James River Group Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent James River Group Inc. for James River Insurance Company added. (Weinerman, Deleela) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Weinerman, Deleela) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-819447-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6164365) by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Weinerman, Deleela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less