This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2020 at 10:13:12 (UTC).

Ssebanakitta v. United States Postal Service

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 Ssebanakitta filed an Other lawsuit against United States Postal Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gwynne E. Birzer and Eric F. Melgren. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01167

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

Presiding Judge

Eric F. Melgren

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fannie Ssebanakitta

Burlington, CO 80807

Defendant

United States Postal Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Emily B. Metzger

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney - Wichita

301 North Main Street, Suite 1200

Wichita, KS 67202-4812

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RESPONSE by Plaintiff Fannie Ssebanakitta re #12 Motion to Dismiss. (mam) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

13 #1

Exhibits 1-3

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Postal Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Postal Service (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of First Contact With Plaintiff Concerning Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by United States Postal Service re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Petition (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Acknowledgment of Service and Filing and State Court Records from Sherman County, Kansas Small Claim's Court by United States Postal Service re #7 State Court Records (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing Records of District Court of Sherman County, Kansas, Case No. 2020-SC-6 by United States Postal Service re #7 State Court Records (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#7

(#7) STATE COURT RECORDS from Sherman County Small Claim's Court. (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant United States Postal Service (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Request for Place of Trial, and Certificate of Proof of Service Pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 81.1(c)(1) to Defendant Fannie Ssebanakitta by United States Postal Service (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant United States Postal Service re #1 Notice of Removal . (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Nan Raymond (USPS) - trial to be held in Wichita. (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Nan Raymond (USPS). (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Small Claims Court, Sherman County, Kansas, case number 2020-CV-6 Trial location of Wichita, filed by Nan Raymond (USPS). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE by Plaintiff Fannie Ssebanakitta re #12 Motion to Dismiss. (mam) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Postal Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Postal Service (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, mailed to Fannie Ssebanakitta P.O. Box 214 Burlington, CO 80807 on 7/10/2020 by regular mail. (sz) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Having received no response to the Motion, the Court grants it as uncontested pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 7.4. Defendant shall have until July 31, 2020 to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/10/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rel) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of First Contact With Plaintiff Concerning Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by United States Postal Service re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Petition (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Acknowledgment of Service and Filing and State Court Records from Sherman County, Kansas Small Claim's Court by United States Postal Service re #7 State Court Records (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing Records of District Court of Sherman County, Kansas, Case No. 2020-SC-6 by United States Postal Service re #7 State Court Records (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT RECORDS from Sherman County Small Claim's Court. (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant United States Postal Service (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Request for Place of Trial, and Certificate of Proof of Service Pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 81.1(c)(1) to Defendant Fannie Ssebanakitta by United States Postal Service (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant United States Postal Service re #1 Notice of Removal . (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff Fannie Ssebanakitta at P.O. Box 214, Burlington, CO 80807. (jk) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Nan Raymond (USPS) - trial to be held in Wichita. (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Nan Raymond (USPS). (Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Small Claims Court, Sherman County, Kansas, case number 2020-CV-6 Trial location of Wichita, filed by Nan Raymond (USPS). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Metzger, Emily) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily B. Metzger