This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:11:52 (UTC).

SS) Simmons. Jr. v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by SS Simmons Jr against Commissioner of Social Security in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01162

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Erica P. Grosjean

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Joseph Simmons. Jr.

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Consent Form

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Flores, E) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

5 #1

Order re Consent

#3

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by John Joseph Simmons. Jr.. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Joseph Simmons. Jr.. (Kuntz, William) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Chen, Carolyn B. added. (Chen, Carolyn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Flores, E) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *William M. Kuntz* *Law Offices of William M. Kuntz* *4780 Arlington Ave.* *Riverside, CA 92504*. (Flores, E) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by John Joseph Simmons. Jr. (Kuntz, William) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Joseph Simmons. Jr.. (Kuntz, William) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by John Joseph Simmons. Jr.. Attorney Kuntz, William M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8423598) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kuntz, William) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less