This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 10:01:13 (UTC).

(SS) Madrigal Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 SS Madrigal Garcia filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01173

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Griselda Madrigal Garcia

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Omar Pena

Attorney at Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law

2440 Tulare St., Suite 320

Fresno, CA 93721

Defendant Attorney

Chantal Jenkins

Attorney at Social Security Administration Office Of General Counsel

160 Spear Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER ADVISING PARTIES OF STAY OF ACTION PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 615. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/10/2020. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

5 #2

Consent Form

5 #1

SAB SOC SEC

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 11/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 SAB SOC SEC, #2 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #1

USM SS Instructions

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM SS Instructions) (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/14/2020: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:20-cv-1173-SAB. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jenkins, Chantal) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER ADVISING PARTIES OF STAY OF ACTION PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 615. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/10/2020. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Griselda Madrigal Garcia pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 11/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 SAB SOC SEC, #2 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM SS Instructions) (Martin-Gill, S) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Griselda Madrigal Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Griselda Madrigal Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less