This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 08:14:19 (UTC).

(SS) Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 SS Lopez filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary S. Austin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01445

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary S. Austin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marilyn Lou Lopez

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Omar Pena

Attorney at Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law

2440 Tulare St., Suite 320

Fresno, CA 93721

 

Court Documents

5 #3

USM SS Instructions

5 #2

Consent Form

5 #1

Order re Consent

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 1/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM SS Instructions) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/14/2020. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 1/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM SS Instructions) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *2440 Tulare Street* *Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/14/2020. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Marilyn Lou Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Marilyn Lou Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less