This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 09:18:43 (UTC).

(SS) Lopez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 SS Lopez filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara A. McAuliffe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01054

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara A. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emmanuel Valentine Santillan Lopez

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Omar Pena

Attorney at Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law

2440 Tulare St., Suite 320

Fresno, CA 93721

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

7 #3

USM Instructions

7 #2

Consent Form

7 #1

Order re Consent

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Instructions) (Jessen, A) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER Regarding Stay of Action signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/3/2020. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/31/2020. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, paragraphs 6, 10. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/14/2020. CASE STAYED. (Valdez, E) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Emmanuel Valentine Santillan Lopez pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Instructions) (Jessen, A) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Regarding Stay of Action signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/3/2020. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/31/2020. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, paragraphs 6, 10. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/31/2020. (Valdez, E) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Emmanuel Valentine Santillan Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Emmanuel Valentine Santillan Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less