This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 08:16:59 (UTC).

(SS) Bulgakov v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 SS Bulgakov filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmund F. Brennan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02031

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund F. Brennan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liliya Bulgakov

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jesse S. Kaplan

Attorney at Attorney at Law

5441 Fair Oaks Blvd., Suite C-1

Carmichael, CA 95608

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Consent Form

#5

(#5) ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 1/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Coll, A) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/14/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and file a statement with the court. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days from the date of this order. The parties are hereby NOTIFIED that, after service of the complaint, this action will be STAYED pursuant to General Order Number 615, and there will be no scheduling order or deadlines in effect pending further order of the court. (Coll, A) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 1/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Coll, A) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jesse S. Kaplan* *5441 Fair Oaks Blvd.* *Suite C-1* *Carmichael, CA 95608*. (Coll, A) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/14/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and file a statement with the court. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days from the date of this order. The parties are hereby NOTIFIED that, after service of the complaint, this action will be STAYED pursuant to General Order Number 615, and there will be no scheduling order or deadlines in effect pending further order of the court. (Coll, A) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Liliya Bulgakov. (Kaplan, Jesse) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Liliya Bulgakov. Attorney Kaplan, Jesse S. added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaplan, Jesse) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less