This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2019 at 07:46:41 (UTC).

(SS) Alcala v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 SS Alcala filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dennis M. Cota. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01579

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dennis M. Cota

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessica Alcala

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harvey Peter Sackett

Attorney at Sackett & Associates, A Professional Law Corporation

1055 Lincoln Ave.

San Jose, CA 95125

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Order re Consent

5 #2

SS Consent Form

#3

(#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/16/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The clerk is DIRECTED to issue process. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and file a statement with the court. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days from the date of this order. (Copy to: USM.) (York, M) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/24/2019 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, within 30 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to submit service documents to the United States Marshall. The filing of a notice that plaintiff has submitted service documents to the United States Marshall shall constitute a sufficient response to this order. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 SS Consent Form) (York, M) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/24/2019 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, within 30 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to submit service documents to the United States Marshall. The filing of a notice that plaintiff has submitted service documents to the United States Marshall shall constitute a sufficient response to this order. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 SS Consent Form) (York, M) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Harvey Peter Sackett* *Sackett & Associates, A Professional Law Corporation* *1055 Lincoln Ave.* *San Jose, CA 95125*. (York, M) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/16/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The clerk is DIRECTED to issue process. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and file a statement with the court. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days from the date of this order. (Copy to: USM.) (York, M) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jessica Alcala. (Sackett, Harvey) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Jessica Alcala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.