This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2020 at 10:43:50 (UTC).

Srinivas v. Fidelity Investments Institutional Services Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Srinivas filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Fidelity Investments Institutional Services Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and Mary S. McElroy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

Mary S. McElroy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kshama Srinivas

Defendant

Fidelity Investments Institutional Services Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael W. Garland

Attorney at McKinnon & Harwood, LLC

1168 Newport Avenue

Pawtucket, RI 02861

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Fidelity Investments Institutional Services Company, Inc. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Request filed by Kshama Srinivas. (Garland, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael W. Garland (Garland, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit b

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1503010 ), filed by Kshama Srinivas.(Garland, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2020: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hicks, Alyson). (Entered: 05/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Fidelity Investments Institutional Services Company, Inc. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Request filed by Kshama Srinivas. (Garland, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael W. Garland (Garland, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1503010 ), filed by Kshama Srinivas.(Garland, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2020: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hicks, Alyson). (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1503010 ), filed by Kshama Srinivas.(Garland, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2020: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hicks, Alyson). (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fidelity Investments Institutional Services Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael W. Garland